EP1938091 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTICALLY INSPECTING GLASS PANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isra Vision Systems AG Industriestrasse 14 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/04] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Isra Vision Systems AG Industriestrasse 14 64297 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDERT, Armin Kordulastrasse 14 45131 Essen / DE | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792429.0 | 17.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP10007 | Priority number, date | DE20051050882 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005050882 | [2008/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045437 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938091 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938091 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/958 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G01N21/958 (EP,US);
G01N2021/9586 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTISCHEN INSPEKTION VON GLASSCHEIBEN | [2008/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTICALLY INSPECTING GLASS PANES | [2008/27] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'INSPECTION OPTIQUE DE VITRES | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2006 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | NL | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | AT | 17.10.2020 | IE | 17.10.2020 | LU | 17.10.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.10.2020 | ||
IE | 17.10.2020 | ||
LU | 17.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.10.2020 | ||
IE | 17.10.2020 | ||
LU | 17.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.10.2020 | ||
LU | 17.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 22.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3108234 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1,4,15 * abstract * * page 10 *; | [A]EP0416302 (FLACHGLAS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US5309222 (KAMEI MITSUHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,15 * abstract *; | [A]US5642198 (LONG WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * column 7, lines 39-42 ** column 11, lines 60-66 *; | [A]WO9834096 (MEDAR INC [US]) [A] 1,12 * figure 6; claims 5,15-17 *; | [X]US6512239 (WEISS ADAM [CA], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 3, line 8 - column 9, line 50; figure 6 *; | [X]US6633377 (WEISS ADAM [CA], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 7, line 38 - column 9, line 13; figure 4 * |