EP1920160 - VACUUM PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 50968 Köln / DE | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREVEN, Alois Plektrudisstr. 6 41812 Erkelenz / DE | 02 /
LONGERICH, Thomas Ursulastr. 12 51149 Köln / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792816.8 | 15.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006EP65315 | Priority number, date | DE20051041500 | 01.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005041500 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025854 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1920160 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1920160 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04D19/04 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
F04D19/042 (EP,US);
F04D27/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2008/40] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAKUUMPUMPE | [2008/20] | English: | VACUUM PUMP | [2008/20] | French: | POMPE A VIDE | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 02.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0979947 (SEIKO SEIKI KK [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02077462 (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003175132 (ISHIKAWA TAKAHARU [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2003219342 (CURRY MARK WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |