EP1917228 - MESOPOROUS METAL-ORGANIC FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUBERT, Markus Alwin-Mittasch-Platz 11 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Ulrich Am Stecken 14a 67435 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
MATTENHEIMER, Hendrick An Der Froschlache 3 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
TONIGOLD, Markus Ingeborg-Bachmann-Strasse 29 89134 Blaustein / DE | [2010/20] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
SCHUBERT, Markus Alwin-mittasch-platz 11 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02 /
MÜLLER, Ulrich Am Stecken 14a 67435 Neustadt / DE | |||
03 /
MATTENHEIMER, Hendrick An Der Froschlache 3 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
04 /
TONIGOLD, Markus Ingeborg-bachmann-strasse 29 89134 Blaustein / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/27] |
Former [2008/19] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06792831.7 | 16.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006EP65346 | Priority number, date | DE20051039654 | 22.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005039654 | [2008/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023119 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1917228 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1917228 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/41, C07F5/06, C01B3/00 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
C07F5/069 (EP,US);
C01B3/00 (KR);
B01J20/226 (EP);
B01J20/3085 (EP);
C01B3/001 (EP,US);
C01B3/0015 (EP,US);
C01B3/0026 (EP,US);
C07C51/418 (EP,US);
C07F5/06 (KR);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/418, C07C63/307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESOPORÖSES METALLORGANISCHES GERÜSTMATERIAL | [2008/19] | English: | MESOPOROUS METAL-ORGANIC FRAMEWORK | [2008/19] | French: | MATERIAU MESOPOREUX A STRUCTURE ORGANOMETALLIQUE | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | AT | 16.08.2011 | LU | 16.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
AT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
AT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
AT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS59155333 (MARUZEN SEKIYU KAGAKU KK) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5648508 (YAGHI OMAR M [US]) [DX] 1-11,13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9905151 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 * |