EP1961223 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A SCRAMBLED CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viaccess Les Collines de l'Arche, Tour Opéra C 92057 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEVALLIER, Anthony 33 rue Lenôtre F-78210 SAINT CYR L'ECOLE / FR | 02 /
LANFRANCHI, Stéphane 14bis, avenue de Saint Mandé F-75012 Paris / FR | 03 /
MAGIS, Erwann 8, rue Théodore de Banville F-75017 Paris / FR | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
CHEVALLIER, Anthony Appt 731 - 1, rue René Jacques F-92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | ||
02 /
LANFRANCHI, Stéphane 36, rue de Picpus F-75012 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
MAGIS, Erwann 8, rue Théodore de Banville F-75017 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06792902.6 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP65459 | Priority number, date | FR20050053852 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0553852 | FR20060051130 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: FR 0651130 | [2008/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007068507 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961223 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961223 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/4623 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N21/6334 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/436 (EP,US);
H04N21/440281 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | H04N7/167, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REGELN DES ZUGRIFFS AUF VERWÜRFELTEN INHALT | [2008/35] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING ACCESS TO A SCRAMBLED CONTENT | [2008/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE D'ACCES A UN CONTENU EMBROUILLE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2006 | AT | 27.03.2013 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | IE | 18.08.2013 | LU | 18.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/33] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 18.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002092016 (OFFER GERO [DE]) [X] 1,10-15,19-21 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO03105475 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 36-51* the whole document *; | [A]US2004088175 (MESSERGES THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 13,14 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] *; | [X]EP1422943 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,10-15,19-21 * the whole document * * claim 1 *; | [XA]EP1439697 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [X] 10-12,29-35 * the whole document * * abstract * [A] 36-51; | [XA] - CUNNINGHAM D ET AL, "Secure pay-per-view testbed", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND SYSTEMS. WASHINGTON, MAY 15 - 18, 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19950515), ISBN 0-8186-7105-X, pages 308 - 311, XP010154613 [X] 19,20 * page 310 * [A] 1-18,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMCS.1995.484940 | [XA] - "FUNCTIONAL MODEL OF A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 64 - 77, XP000559450 [X] 19,20 * paragraph [07.2] * [A] 1-18,21-51 | by applicant | WO9716924 | US2002114465 |