EP1926910 - PISTON PUMP COMPRISING AN IMPROVED PISTON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULLER, Wolfgang Birkenweg 5a 74389 Cleebronn / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Marc Langhansstr. 8 71720 Oberstenfeld / DE | [2008/23] | Application number, filing date | 06793017.2 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006EP65686 | Priority number, date | DE20051042197 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005042197 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007028728 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926910 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04, F04B53/14 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
F04B1/0408 (EP,US);
F04B53/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2008/41] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOLBENPUMPE MIT VERBESSERTEM KOLBEN | [2008/23] | English: | PISTON PUMP COMPRISING AN IMPROVED PISTON | [2008/23] | French: | POMPE A PISTON AYANT UN PISTON AMELIORE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 08.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19747936 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19750851 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6341950 (SCHULLER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5980214 (DJORDJEVIC ILIJA [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |