EP1931567 - TURBINE ENGINE MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/25] | TURBOJET ENGINE MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR AIRCRAFT | ||
[2011/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Correction of patent specification | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2012/14] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS 316 route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states AIRBUS France 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIOCHON, Lionel 5 Rue Dérat F-31000 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
CETOUT, Jean-Michel 5 Route de Seysses F-31100 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
LAFONT, Laurent 20, Rue de l'Autan F-31320 Pechbusque / FR | 04 /
CHARTIER, David 8 Rue Viollet Le Duc F-31100 Toulouse / FR | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2008/25] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06793901.7 | 29.09.2006 | [2018/31] | WO2006EP66873 | Priority number, date | FR20050052989 | 03.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0552989 | [2008/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039556 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1931567 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1931567 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/14] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1931567 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64D27/18 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B64D27/18 (EP,US);
B64D27/40 (US);
B64D27/402 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | AUFHÄNGUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN TRIEBWERK FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG | [2011/49] | English: | TURBINE ENGINE MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR AIRCRAFT | [2011/49] | French: | MAT D'ACCROCHAGE DE TURBOREACTEUR POUR AERONEF | [2008/25] |
Former [2008/25] | AUFHÄNGUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN TURBINENSTRAHLTRIEBWERK FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG | ||
Former [2008/25] | TURBOJET ENGINE MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR AIRCRAFT | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 21.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2006 | AT | 04.04.2012 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | IT | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | LV | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | PL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | IE | 29.06.2012 | LU | 29.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | ES | 15.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | DE | 01.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
DE | 01.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4013246 (NIGHTINGALE DOUGLAS JOHN); | [A]US6095456 (POWELL DONALD T [US]); | [A]US6126110 (SEAQUIST JOHN D [US], et al); | [A]EP1053937 (AEROSPATIALE AIRBUS [FR]); | [A]US2005116093 (MACHADO STEPHANE [FR], et al) |