EP1943384 - DYEING OF WOOL FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGEN, Manfred C/o P. Josef Jungen Am Kaninsberg 11 52511 Geilenkirchen-gillrath / DE | 02 /
VIERLING, Jean-Pierre 9, Rue Du Conquelicot F-68400 Riedisheim / FR | 03 /
SCHMITT, Udo Johann-karl-grether-strasse 4 79650 Schopfheim / DE | 04 /
MARAZZI, Rino Reitweg 17 CH-4133 Pratteln / CH | [2011/45] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
JUNGEN, Manfred C/o P. Josef Jungen Am Kaninsberg 11 52511 Geilenkirchen-gillrath / DE | ||
02 /
VIERLING, Jean-Pierre 9, Rue Du Conquelicot F-68400 Riedisheim / FR | |||
03 /
SCHMITT, Udo Johann-karl-grether-strasse 4 79650 Schopfheim / DE | |||
04 /
MARAZZI, Rino Reitweg 17 CH-4133 Pratteln / CH | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Carola, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Jacobi, Carola, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Dünnwald, Dieter, et al Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | ||
Former [2008/29] | Dünnwald, Dieter Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | Application number, filing date | 06793903.3 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006EP66875 | Priority number, date | EP20050021865 | 07.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05021865 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042408 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943384 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943384 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06P1/607, D06P3/14 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
D06P1/6076 (EP,KR,US);
D06P3/14 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÄRBEN VON WOLLFASERN | [2008/29] | English: | DYEING OF WOOL FIBRES | [2008/29] | French: | COLORATION DE FIBRES DE LAINE | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 17.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2006 | AT | 09.11.2011 | BE | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH373012 (GEIGY AG J R [CH]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 54 - page 2, line 8 ** example 1 *; | [A]US3104931 (RICHARD CASTY, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 11 - line 25 * * column 4, line 35 - line 48 * * example - *; | [A]DE1469657 (CIBA GEIGY) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 16 * * example 2 *; | [A]US3816529 (LOFFELMAN F) [A] 1-8 * example 39 * |