EP1918715 - FIBROSIS MARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proyecto de Biomedicina Cima, S.L. C/Etxesakan 28, Oficina 5, (Pta. Baja) 31180 Cizur Mayor (Navarra) / ES | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SESMA AGUIRRE, Laura Fundacion para la Investigacion Médica Aplicada Avda Pío XII, 55, 31008 Pamplona / ES | 02 /
FERNANDEZ IRIGOYEN, Joaquín Fundacion para la Investigacion Médica Aplicada Avda Pío XII, 55, 31008 Pamplona / ES | 03 /
PRIETO VALTUEÑA, Jesús Fundacion para la Investigacion Médica Aplicada Avda Pío XII, 55, 31008 Pamplona / ES | 04 /
AVILA ZARAGOZA, Matías Fundacion para la Investigacion Médica Aplicada Avda Pío XII, 55, 31008 Pamplona / ES | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A. Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Ungria Lopez, Javier c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06794042.9 | 22.06.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006ES00367 | Priority number, date | ES20050001611 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: ES 200501611 | [2008/19] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003670 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918715 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 11.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/576 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (ES);
G01N2800/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Extension states | AL | 31.01.2008 | BA | 31.01.2008 | HR | 31.01.2008 | MK | 31.01.2008 | RS | 31.01.2008 | Title | German: | FIBROSEMARKER | [2008/19] | English: | FIBROSIS MARKERS | [2008/19] | French: | MARQUEURS DE LA FIBROSE | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2008 | Translation filed | 31.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 15.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4894442 (TOYAMA SAKUJI [JP], et al); | [A]WO9308215 (CETUS ONCOLOGY CORP [US]); | [A]US5310655 (ZIMMERHACKL LOTHAR [DE], et al); | [A]US5747274 (JACKOWSKI GEORGE [CA]); |