EP1948153 - TREATMENT OF SYMPTOMS OF PARKINSON`S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION CORPORATION Orionintie 1 02200 Espoo / FI | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISSINEN, Helena Nelikkokuja 8 A 32 FI-02230 Espoo / FI | 02 /
VAHTERISTO, Mikko Kalevankatu 7 A 6 FI-70500 Kuopio / FI | 03 /
KUOPPAMÄKI, Mikko Katteluksentie 9 FI-21120 Raisio / FI | 04 /
ELLMÉN, Juha Impivaarantie 8 A FI-20320 Turku / FI | 05 /
LEINONEN, Mika Bergsgatan 2 S-SE-11223 Stockholm / SE | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
NISSINEN, Helena Ellipsipolku 4 A 23 FI-02100 Espoo / FI | ||
02 /
VAHTERISTO, Mikko Kalevankatu 7 A 6 FI-70500 Kuopio / FI | |||
03 /
KUOPPAMÄKI, Mikko Katteluksentie 9 FI-21120 Raisio / FI | |||
04 /
ELLMÉN, Juha Impivaarantie 8 A FI-20320 Turku / FI | |||
05 /
LEINONEN, Mika Primusgatan 82 S-SE-11267 Stockholm / SE | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06794082.5 | 20.09.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006FI00306 | Priority number, date | US20050718741P | 21.09.2005 Original published format: US 718741 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007034024 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1948153 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198, A61K31/277, A61P25/16 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/277 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | 06.03.2008 | BA | 06.03.2008 | HR | 06.03.2008 | MK | 06.03.2008 | RS | 06.03.2008 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG DER SYMPTOME VON PARKINSON-KRANKHEIT | [2008/31] | English: | TREATMENT OF SYMPTOMS OF PARKINSON`S DISEASE | [2008/31] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES SYMPTOMES DE LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [LX]WO0101984 (ORION CORP [FI], et al) [LX] 1-6,8,10,1-6,8,10,1-6,8,10 * claim 21 * * claim 21 * * claim 21 *; | [LPX]WO2006051154 (ORION CORP [FI], et al) [LPX] 1-5,8,10,1-5,8,10,1-5,8,10 * claims 1,3-5,7,14 * * claims 1,3-5,7,14 * * claims 1,3-5,7,14 *; | [X]GB2348371 (SOARES DA SILVA PATRICIO [PT]) [X] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * claims 14-20 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * claims 14-20 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * claims 14-20 *; | [X] - NOVARTIS, "Stalevo 50, Stalevo 100, Stalevo 150 ( carbidopa, levodopa, and entacapone) Tablets", INTERNET ARTICLE, (200401), URL: http://www.pharma.us.novartis.com/product/pi/pdf/stalevo.pdf, (20070213), XP002419767 [X] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * | [X] - MARK ROASEAU, "DRUG MONOGRAPH: STALEVO", (20031120), URL: www.heritage-info.com/mocaidrx/files/drug_monographs/1203/Stalevomon.doc -, (20070213), XP002419779 [X] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * | [PX] - JOST W H ET AL, "Efficacy and tolerability of Stalevo (R) in patients with Parkinson's disease experiencing wearing-off", AKTUELLE NEUROLOGIE, THIEME, STUTTGART,, DE, (200511), vol. 32, no. Suppl 6, ISSN 0302-4350, pages S318 - S325, XP009074453 [PX] 1-10,1-10,1-10 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2005-915261 |