EP1966041 - ARRANGEMENT FOR AND METHOD OF PROVIDING COOLING ENERGY TO A COOLING MEDIUM CIRCUIT OF A MARINE VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Finland Oy Tarhaajantie 2 65380 Vaasa / FI | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVANDER, Oskar Pietinkuja 9 FI-20900 Turku / FI | 02 /
SIPILÄ, Tuomas Ispoisten Kiertotie 18 B FI-20880 Turku / FI | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Finnilä, Kim Larseman, et al Berggren Oy Ab Antinkatu 3 C P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Finnilä, Kim Larseman, et al AWEK Industrial Patents Ltd Oy P.O. Box 230 FIN-00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06794142.7 | 04.10.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006FI50425 | Priority number, date | FI20050005707 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: FI 20055707 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007074210 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1966041 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1966041 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B63J2/00, B63J2/12, B63J2/14 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
B63J2/00 (EP,FI,KR,NO,US);
B63J2/12 (EP,KR,NO,US);
B63J2/14 (EP,KR,NO,US);
F17C9/02 (FI);
Y02T70/00 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR UND METHODE FÜR BEREITSTELLUNG VON KÜHLENERGIE FÜR EINEN KÜHLMITTELKREISLAUF EINES SEEFAHRZEUGS | [2008/37] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR AND METHOD OF PROVIDING COOLING ENERGY TO A COOLING MEDIUM CIRCUIT OF A MARINE VESSEL | [2008/37] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR DE L'ENERGIE DE REFROIDISSEMENT A UN CIRCUIT D'AGENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN NAVIRE | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | IE | 04.10.2009 | LU | 04.10.2009 | BG | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 04.10.2009 | ||
LU | 04.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 04.10.2009 | ||
LU | 04.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 04.10.2009 | ||
BG | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 04.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB766128 (WILLARD LANGDON MORRISON) [X] 1-3,6,1-3,6,1-3,6 * page 1, line 77 - page 3, line 52; figure 1; claim 8 * * page 1, line 77 - page 3, line 52; figure 1; claim 8 * * page 1, line 77 - page 3, line 52; figure 1; claim 8 * [Y] 4,5,7-9,4,5,7-9,4,5,7-9; | [Y]DE3225300 (KOBER DRAGO DIPL ING, et al) [Y] 4,4,4 * figure 1; claim 1 * * figure 1; claim 1 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0252328 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [Y] 4,5,8,9,4,5,8,9,4,5,8,9 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *; | [A]WO9638656 (CABOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * abstract * * abstract ** abstract *; | [Y]EP1043551 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [Y] 5,8,9,5,8,9,5,8,9 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE19940367 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,1,2,1,2 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 27; figure 1 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 27; figure 1 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 27; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,7-9,4,5,7-9,4,5,7-9; | [Y]WO2004031644 (HAMWORTHY KSE A S [NO], et al) [Y] 7,7,7 * figures 1,2; claim 3 * * figures 1,2; claim 3 * * figures 1,2; claim 3 * | by applicant | GB766128 |