EP1937486 - LASER MARKING OF SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DataLase Ltd Unit 3, Wheldon Road Widnes Cheshire WA8 8FW / GB | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUBBS, Brian DataLase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes WA8 8FW / GB | 02 /
GREEN, William Datalase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes WA8 8FW / GB | [2014/21] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
STUBBS, Brian DataLase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes WA8 8FW / GB | ||
02 /
GREEN, William Datalase Ltd. Unit 3 Wheldon Road Widnes WA8 8FW / GB | Representative(s) | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2013/32] |
Former [2008/27] | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06794881.0 | 23.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006GB03945 | Priority number, date | GB20050021513 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: GB 0521513 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045912 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937486 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937486 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26, B41M5/30, C09D1/00, C09D7/12, C09D11/02, // B41M5/32, C08K3/24 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
B41M5/26 (EP,US);
B41M5/30 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (EP,US);
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
B41M5/32 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | B41M5/26, B41M5/30, C09D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERMARKIERUNG VON SUBSTRATEN | [2008/27] | English: | LASER MARKING OF SUBSTRATES | [2008/27] | French: | MARQUAGE LASER DE SUBSTRATS | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2006 | AT | 21.05.2014 | BE | 21.05.2014 | BG | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | NL | 21.05.2014 | PL | 21.05.2014 | RO | 21.05.2014 | SE | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | TR | 21.05.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | IS | 21.09.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | IE | 23.10.2014 | LU | 23.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/31] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1400434 (ICI LTD) [X] 20 * page 1, lines 9-12,31,32 *; | [X]GB1522918 (BAYER AG) [X] 20 * page 1, lines 10,11,57-63 *; | [X]WO02068205 (SHERWOOD TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,13-20 * page 5, line 22 - page 7 *; | [X]US2004261663 (YAMADA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [X] 20 * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] *; | [X]US2005186511 (KHAN NAZIR [GB]) [X] 1-4,6-10,13-20 * paragraphs [0010] , [0035] , [0044] - [0050] *; | [PX]WO2006067073 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,10,13-20 * page 5, lines 23-31 * * page 14, lines 25-29 ** page 15, lines 28-30 *; | [E]WO2006129078 (DATALASE LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-4,6,7,10,13-20 * pages 1-5 * | by applicant | WO02068205 | WO2006067073 | WO2006129078 |