EP1937421 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING SHALE SHAKER OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/27] | METHOD FOR FACILITATING SHALE SHAKER OPERATION | ||
[2017/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Oilwell Varco, L.P. 7909 Parkwood Circle Drive Houston, TX 77036 / US | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Eric 8913 Summerdale Lane Conroe, Texas 77302 / US | 02 /
ELLISON, Leon 29010 Lazy Pine Drive Huffman, Texas 77336 / US | 03 /
KAMMANN, Reinhold Schaffeld 12 29342 Wienhausen / DE | 04 /
LAM, Clive, Chemo 15922 Oak Island Drive Tomball, Texas 77375 / US | 05 /
WORMS, Manfred, Hermann Maisfeld 15 29336 Nienhagen / DE | 06 /
MCCLUNG, Guy, Lamont, III 8002 Hertfordshire Circle Spring, Texas 77379 / US | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [2017/30] |
Former [2008/27] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06794988.3 | 17.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006GB50331 | Priority number, date | US20050255160 | 20.10.2005 Original published format: US 255160 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045922 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937421 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937421 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/46, B07B13/18, E21B21/06, B01D33/03 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
B07B13/18 (EP,US);
B01D33/0376 (EP,NO,US);
B01D33/0384 (EP,US);
B07B1/42 (EP,US);
B07B1/46 (EP,US);
B07B1/4654 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | B07B13/18, B07B1/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DES SCHIEFERSCHÜTTLERBETRIEBS | [2017/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING SHALE SHAKER OPERATION | [2017/09] | French: | METHODE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FACILITER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TAMIS VIBRANT | [2017/09] |
Former [2008/27] | VERFAHREN ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DES SCHIEFERSCHÜTTLERBETRIEBS | ||
Former [2008/27] | METHOD FOR FACILITATING SHALE SHAKER OPERATION | ||
Former [2008/27] | METHODE POUR FACILITER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TAMIS VIBRANT | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2006 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | IE | 17.10.2017 | LU | 17.10.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.10.2006 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.10.2006 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.10.2006 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
IE | 17.10.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
LU | 17.10.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4698631 (KELLY JR JOSEPH L [US], et al) [DA] 1-8,12,13,18,29-31,33-37,39,40 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, line 6 - line 10 * * column 3, line 22 - line 39 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 3 * * figure - *; | [X]DE19921409 (HOSOKAWA ALPINE AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-30,37-40 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 4, line 35 * * figure - *; | [X]WO02080043 (METSO MINERALS TAMPERE OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-24,27,28,34-40 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 1, line 22 - line 31 * * page 2, line 9 - line 30 * * page 4, line 11 - line 13 * * page 5, line 13 - line 28 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]WO02092245 (MELWIRE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-40 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 28 * * page 6, line 8 - line 14 * * page 7, line 3 - page 11, line 29 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]US2004074817 (ADAMS THOMAS C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-11,18-28,39,40 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0113] * * figures 2,5,12-16 *; | [E]US2006243643 (SCOTT ERIC [US], et al) [E] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0253] - paragraph [0260] * * paragraph [0263] - paragraph [0265] * * paragraph [0275] - paragraph [0280] * * paragraph [0299] * * claims 24-27 ** figure - * | Examination | US6100804 | WO03057376 | US2005230109 |