EP1922866 - METHOD TO DETERMINE THE COMPLETENESS OF A SERVICE GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHJOLAINEN, Topi Punavuorenkatu 4 D 22 FIN-00120 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
JANSKY, Martin Rakuunapiha 8 FIN-02620 Espoo / FI | 03 /
PAILA, Toni Luoteispolku 10 FIN-10160 Degerby / FI | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2013/30] |
Former [2008/21] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06795428.9 | 28.08.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006IB02444 | Priority number, date | US20050220724 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: US 220724 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007029097 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1922866 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922866 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
H04L65/764 (EP,US);
H04N1/00 (KR);
H04N21/26283 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4586 (EP,US);
H04N21/654 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/8402 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04H20/95 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/21] | H04N5/445, H04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER VOLLSTÄNDIGKEIT EINES DIENSTFÜHRERS | [2008/21] | English: | METHOD TO DETERMINE THE COMPLETENESS OF A SERVICE GUIDE | [2008/21] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER L'EXHAUSTIVITE D'UN GUIDE DES SERVICES | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2006 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2396228 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1-25 * Section "Electronic Service Guide" *; | [X] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "tm-cbms1199_ESGSpec_050809v7clean.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20050817), XP017805568 [X] 1-25 * Section 4 ESG communication process Section 7 ESG Fragment encapsulation Section 8 ESG Transport * | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "tm-cbms1225.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20050317), XP017804596 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "tm-cbms1275-multisession vs. single ESG session study.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20050505), XP017804620 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "tm-cbms1213.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20050317), XP017804593 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - "Service Guide for Mobile Broadcast Services; Draft Version 1.0", OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE; OMA-TS-BCAST_SERVICEGUIDE-V1_0_0-20050902-D, (20050902), URL: http://www.member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/public_documents/bac/BCAST/Permanent_documents, XP003008412 | Examination | WO2004056096 |