EP1927271 - METHOD TO DETERMINE A RELATIVE POSITION OF DEVICES IN A NETWORK, AND NETWORK OF DEVICES FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/45] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVENS, Hendrik c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/23] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06795805.8 | 29.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006IB52989 | Priority number, date | EP20050108323 | 12.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05108323 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007031891 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927271 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927271 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H05B47/18 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER RELATIVEN POSITION VON VORRICHTUNGEN IN EINEM NETZWERK UND NETZWERK VON VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2008/23] | English: | METHOD TO DETERMINE A RELATIVE POSITION OF DEVICES IN A NETWORK, AND NETWORK OF DEVICES FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | [2008/23] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA POSITION RELATIVE DE DISPOSITIFS DANS UN RESEAU, ET RESEAU DE DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCEDE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2006 | AT | 09.11.2011 | BE | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9501030 (FARNSWORTH WILLIAM DAVID & HM [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2002126020 (WANG LING [US], et al); | [AD]US2003222603 (MOGILNER RAFAEL [IL], et al) | by applicant | US2003222603 |