EP1922090 - SANITARY NAPKINS WITH HYDROPHOBIC LOTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/13] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATTO, Joseph, Anthony 9119 Willow Creek Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 02 /
WARREN, Raphael 6715 West Farmacres Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45237 / US | 03 /
HAMMONS, John, Lee 7379 Dust Commander Court Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2012/22] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128 Sambuceto 66020 S. Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | ||
Former [2009/43] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128-130 66020 Sambuceto (Chieti) / IT | ||
Former [2009/16] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | L'Huillier, Florent Charles Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06795950.2 | 07.09.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006IB53158 | Priority number, date | US20050222654 | 09.09.2005 Original published format: US 222654 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007029198 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1922090 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922090 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/40, A61L15/34 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61L15/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/472 (EP,US);
A61F13/51305 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/8405 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/40 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/51117 (KR);
A61F2013/8432 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8458 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8461 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/21] | A61L15/34, A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SANITÄRBINDEN MIT HYDROPHOBEN LOTIONEN | [2008/21] | English: | SANITARY NAPKINS WITH HYDROPHOBIC LOTIONS | [2008/21] | French: | SERVIETTES HYGIENIQUES AVEC LOTIONS HYDROPHOBES | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2006 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | GB | 07.09.2016 | IE | 07.09.2016 | LU | 07.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | FR | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.09.2006 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
GB | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.09.2006 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
GB | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
GB | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
GB | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03028776 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 10 * * page 14, line 21 - page 16, line 23 * * page 21, line 25 - page 22, line 2 * * page 23, line 30 - page 24, line 2 * * claims 1,2,10-14 * [Y] 12-22; | [Y]WO0100155 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [Y] 12-17 * page 5, lines 13-19 * * page 13, lines 7-16 * * claims 1-3,10-16,23-29 *; | [Y]WO0004870 (BIOMED RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGI [US], et al) [Y] 18-20 * page 4, lines 24-30 * * page 5, lines 15-22 * * claims 1,4-7 *; | [Y]WO02087517 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 21,22 * abstract * * page 5, lines 8-25 * * claims 1-3 * |