EP2070155 - PHASED SHIFTED OSCILATOR AND ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beam Semiconductor Ltd. 7 Oppenheimer Street, Suite 15 76701 Rehovot / IL | [2016/28] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Beam Networks Ltd. 2A Habarzel Street 61131 Tel Aviv / IL | ||
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Beam Networks Ltd. 22 Haknesset Hagdola 62917 Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILANO, Alberto 9/6 Shimoni St. 76248 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
WEINSTEIN, Hillel 22 Haknesset Hagdola 62917 Tel Aviv / IL | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 06796137.5 | 03.10.2006 | [2009/25] | WO2006IL01144 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008041222 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2070155 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/34, H01Q3/36, H01Q3/38, H01Q3/40, H01Q3/42, H03B5/08, H03B5/18 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H03B5/1852 (EP,US);
H03L7/00 (KR);
H01Q3/34 (KR);
H01Q3/38 (KR);
H01Q3/42 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | H01Q3/34, H01Q3/36, H01Q3/38, H01Q3/40, H01Q3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | PHASENVERSCHOBENER OSZILLATOR UND ANTENNE | [2009/25] | English: | PHASED SHIFTED OSCILATOR AND ANTENNA | [2009/25] | French: | OSCILLATEUR DÉPHASÉ ET ANTENNE | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 18.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 02.08.2015 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2016/13] | 01.06.2016 | Resumption of proceedings | [2016/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3238528 (HINES MARION E) [A] 1-26 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 8; figures 2,7 * * column 6, line 11 - line 40 *; | [A]US4692714 (GALANI ZVI [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0527470 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * column 3, line 47 - line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]US5752180 (GUO CHAOYING [FR], et al) [A] 1-26 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 67; figure 2 *; | [A] - SHIOMI H ET AL, "Phase-shifterless beam scanning of acrive phased array antenna using injection locked oscillator", TENCON 2004. 2004 IEEE REGION 10 CONFERENCE CHIANG MAI, THAILAND NOV. 21-24, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041121), vol. C, doi:10.1109/TENCON.2004.1414850, ISBN 978-0-7803-8560-3, pages 628 - 631, XP010798049 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.2004.1414850 | International search | [Y]US6759980 (CHEN SHUGUANG [US], et al); | [X]US2005163254 (SUZUKI YASUNORI [JP], et al) | Examination | US3653046 | US4394660 | US5977910 | US6317008 | US6759980 | US2005184816 | - F.X. SINNESBICHLER ET AL, "A Si/SiGe HBT dielectric resonator push-push oscillator at 58 GHz", IEEE MICROWAVE AND GUIDED WAVE LETTERS., US, (20000401), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1109/75.846927, ISSN 1051-8207, pages 145 - 147, XP055398182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/75.846927 | - RAMIREZ F ET AL, "Nonlinear simulation techniques for the optimized design of push-push oscillators", 2003 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST.(IMS 2003). PHILADELPHIA, PA, JUNE 8 - 13, 2003; [IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030608), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/MWSYM.2003.1210590, ISBN 978-0-7803-7695-3, pages 2157 - 2160, XP010746542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2003.1210590 | - FRANZ X SINNESBICHLER F, "Hybrid Millimeter-Wave Push-Push Oscillators Using Silicon-Germanium HBTs", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, PLENUM, USA, (20030201), vol. 51, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9480, XP011076893 | - SHIH-CHIEH YEN ET AL, "An Nth-harmonic oscillator using an N-push coupled oscillator array with voltage-clamping circuits", 2003 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST.(IMS 2003). PHILADELPHIA, PA, JUNE 8 - 13, 2003; [IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030608), doi:10.1109/MWSYM.2003.1210593, ISBN 978-0-7803-7695-3, pages 2169 - 2172vol.3, XP032412687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2003.1210593 |