EP1997371 - OVERFLOW DEVICE FOR WATER TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tominaga Jyushi Kogyosho 10-32 Shinke 2-chome, Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 577-0025 / JP | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARITA, Ryuzo 2320-1, Usuita Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0861 / JP | 02 /
TOMINAGA, Kazutoshi KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOMINAGA JYUSHI KOGYOSHO, 10-32, Shinke 2-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 577-0025 / JP | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/49] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06797057.4 | 30.08.2006 | [2008/49] | WO2006JP317084 | Priority number, date | JP20060079517 | 22.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006079517 | [2008/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007108146 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1997371 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01K63/04, B01D35/027, C02F1/24, C02F1/40, C02F3/30 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A01K63/045 (EP,US);
C02F3/04 (EP,US);
C02F3/043 (EP,US);
C02F3/10 (EP,US);
C02F3/2806 (EP,US);
C02F3/301 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERLAUFVORRICHTUNG FÜR WASSERTANK | [2008/49] | English: | OVERFLOW DEVICE FOR WATER TANK | [2008/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TROP-PLEIN POUR RÉSERVOIR D'EAU | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2008 | Translation filed | 22.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2225498 (HOLLANDER ELVIN E) [X] 1-2 * page 1, column R, line 31 - line 37 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]US4861465 (AUGUSTYNIAK STANLEY D [US]) [Y] 3-5 * column 3, line 20 - line 40 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 2 * * figures 1,7,8 * |