EP1932880 - GAS BARRIER FILM, GAS BARRIER LAMINATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF THE FILM OR LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals Tohcello Co., Ltd. Kanda Mitoshiro-cho 7 Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8485 / JP | [2011/49] |
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states Tohcello Co., Ltd. 3-3, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAKAMATA, Tomoyoshi c/o Tohcello Co., Ltd., 9, Kitatone Koga-shi, Ibaraki 3060213 / JP | 02 /
NOMOTO, Akira c/o Tohcello Co., Ltd., 9, Kitatone Koga-shi, Ibaraki 3060213 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA, Osamu c/o Tohcello Co., Ltd. 9, Kitatone Koga-shi, Ibaraki 3060213 / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Yoshihisa c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | 05 /
TSURUGI, Kou c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | 06 /
TANABE, Nobuhiro c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | 07 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoshihiro c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | [2011/46] |
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
HAKAMATA, Tomoyoshi c/o Tohcello Co., Ltd., 9, Kitatone Koga-shi, Ibaraki 3060213 / JP | ||
02 /
NOMOTO, Akira c/o Tohcello Co., Ltd., 9, Kitatone Koga-shi, Ibaraki 3060213 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKAMURA, Osamu c/o Tohcello Co., Ltd., 9, Kitatone Koga-shi, Ibaraki 3060213 / JP | |||
04 /
INOUE, Yoshihisa c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | |||
05 /
TSURUGI, Kou c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | |||
06 /
TANABE, Nobuhiro c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | |||
07 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoshihiro c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/25] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06797490.7 | 30.08.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006JP317591 | Priority number, date | JP20050250395 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: JP 2005250395 | JP20050325419 | 09.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005325419 | [2008/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007026935 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1932880 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1932880 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1932880 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/02, B32B27/30, C08L29/04 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
C08F261/04 (EP,US);
C08L33/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (KR);
C08L29/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L29/04, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D129/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C09D151/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/42] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GASBARRIEREFOLIE, GASBARRIERELAMINAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER FOLIE ODER DES LAMINATS | [2008/25] | English: | GAS BARRIER FILM, GAS BARRIER LAMINATE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF THE FILM OR LAMINATE | [2008/25] | French: | FILM BARRIÈRE AUX GAZ, STRATIFIÉ BARRIÈRE AUX GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DU FILM OU DU STRATIFIÉ | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2008 | Translation filed | 10.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 01.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1816159 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [E] 1-3,5,6,8,9,12-15 * example -; claim - * * paragraph [0015] *; | [E]EP1754726 (TOHCELLO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,5,6,8,9,12-15 * claim - * * examples 5,6 *; | [X]EP0645428 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,12-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1464480 (TOHCELLO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,12-15 * example -; claim - * * page 6, lines 22-56 * |