EP1936760 - IC SOCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Japan G.K. 5-8, Hisamoto 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kagawa 213-8535 / JP | [2010/21] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP K.K. 3-5-8 Hisamoto, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Hidenori c/o Tyco Electronics AMP K.K. 3-5-8, Hisamoto, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO, Shinichi c/o Tyco Electronics AMP K.K. 3-5-8, Hisamoto, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06797832.0 | 12.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006JP318025 | Priority number, date | JP20050299168 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005299168 | [2008/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007043269 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936760 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/76 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H01R12/88 (EP,US);
H01R13/2442 (EP,US);
H01R2201/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/45] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IC-SOCKEL | [2008/26] | English: | IC SOCKET | [2008/26] | French: | SUPPORT DE CIRCUIT INTEGRE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | Translation filed | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 14.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004266246 (HASHIMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4; | [YA]US2005026503 (TROUT DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * paragraphs [0100] - [0121]; figures 35-58 * [A] 2,4; | [YA]TWM266621U (HON HAI PREC IND CO LTD [TW]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [YPA]US2006024987 (HUANG YAO-CHI [TW], et al) [YP] 1-3 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025]; figures 7,8 *[A] 4 |