EP2068606 - JUNCTION STRUCTURE, METHOD OF JOINING, WIRING BOARD AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Company, Ltd. 5-8, Higashishinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Company, Ltd. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUMA, Toshiaki Akita Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd. 27-4, Aza, Nakajimashita Aizome-machi Tsuchizakiminato Akita-shi Akita 011-8510 / JP | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Solf, Alexander Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06797991.4 | 14.09.2006 | [2009/24] | WO2006JP318279 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008032386 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2068606 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H05K3/4617 (EP,US);
B23K1/0016 (EP,US);
B23K35/001 (EP,US);
B23K35/0238 (EP,US);
B23K35/262 (EP,US);
B23K35/3613 (EP,US);
B23K35/3618 (EP,US);
B23K35/362 (EP,US);
H05K3/341 (EP,US);
H05K3/3463 (EP,US);
C25D5/48 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0269 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1476 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49149 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR, VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN, LEITERPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSPROZESS DAFÜR | [2009/24] | English: | JUNCTION STRUCTURE, METHOD OF JOINING, WIRING BOARD AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2009/24] | French: | STRUCTURE DE JONCTION, PROCÉDÉ DE JONCTION, PLAQUETTE DE CÂBLAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | Translation filed | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 30.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5939789 (KAWAI MICHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * columns 7,8; figure 5 *; | [X]US2002090756 (TAGO MASAMOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0081]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2003156969 (CHOI WON K [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2005275096 (ZENG KEJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * |