EP1796425 - SPEAKER DAMPER AND SPEAKER USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAHASHI, Osamu | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
FUNAHASHI Osamu Matsushita Electric Ind.Co.Ltd IPROC IPD.Center 19F Matsushita IMP Bld. 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06798061.5 | 15.09.2006 | [2007/24] | WO2006JP318398 | Priority number, date | JP20050273328 | 21.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005273328 | JP20060131331 | 10.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006131331 | [2007/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007034751 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796425 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/02, H04R9/04 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H04R9/043 (EP,US);
H04R9/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/46] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHERDÄMPFER UND LAUTSPRECHER DAMIT | [2007/24] | English: | SPEAKER DAMPER AND SPEAKER USING THE SAME | [2007/24] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE HAUT-PARLEUR ET HAUT-PARLEUR EQUIPE DUDIT AMORTISSEUR | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2007 | Translation filed | 16.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 22.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/37] | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6655495 (KUZE MITSUKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * column 6, line 8 - line 10; figure 5 *; | [Y]US6735323 (CHANG GEORGE [TW]) [Y] 4,7 * abstract *; | [A]US2004165746 (KREITMEIER LEONHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,5* abstract *; | [XY]EP1549107 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8,9 * column 4, paragraph 31; figure 2 * [Y] 4,7 |