EP1929668 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPTIMIZING NEIGHBOR LIST AUTOMATICALLY IN ASYNCHRONOUS WCDMA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KTFreetel Co., Ltd. 7-18, Sincheon-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-240 / KR | [2015/16] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states KTFreetel Co., Ltd. 7-18, Sinchon-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul 138-240 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Shin-Jae 203-606, Hyundai Apt., Hosumaeul Janghang-dong, Ilsan-gu, Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do, 411-380 / KR | [2015/16] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
KIM, Shin-Jae 203-606, Hyundai Apt., Hosumaeul Janghang-dong, Ilsan-gu, Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do, 411-380 / KR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Corret, Hélène, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06798559.8 | 28.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006KR03389 | Priority number, date | KR20050079542 | 29.08.2005 Original published format: KR 20050079542 | KR20050123415 | 14.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050123415 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007027034 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929668 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929668 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
H04W36/00835 (EP,US);
H04W36/0061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | FR [2015/16] |
Former [2008/40] | FR | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN OPTIMIEREN DER NACHBARLISTE IN EINEM ASYNCHRONEN WCDMA-NETZ | [2008/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPTIMIZING NEIGHBOR LIST AUTOMATICALLY IN ASYNCHRONOUS WCDMA NETWORK | [2008/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR OPTIMISER AUTOMATIQUEMENT LA LISTE DE VOISINAGE DANS UN RESEAU AMRC A BANDE LARGE ASYNCHRONE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 01.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5854981 (WALLSTEDT KENNETH YNGVE [SE], et al) [I] 1,3-9,11-15 * line 5 - column 5, line 16 * * column 13, line 61 - column 14, line 26 * * column 16, line 40 - column 17, line 15 * * abstract * [A] 2,10; | [IA]US6119005 (SMOLIK KENNETH FRANK [US]) [I] 1,3-9,11-15 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 37 * * column 6, line 21 - column 9, line 24 * * abstract *[A] 2,10 | International search | [A]US6119005 (SMOLIK KENNETH FRANK [US]); | [A]US2001021179 (TIEDEMANN EDWARD G [US], et al); | [AP]US7065361 (FORTUNA FREDERICK L [US]) | by applicant | US5854981 | US6119005 | KR20040048038 | KR20050024643 |