EP1922881 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING PERFORMANCE OF ENTROPY CODING, VIDEO CODING METHOD AND APPARATUS USING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Bae-Keun 142-10 Chunui-dong, Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 420-858 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Woo-Jin 108-703 Hwanggol maeul Jugong 2-danji Apt., Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06798638.0 | 04.09.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006KR03492 | Priority number, date | US20050713746P | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 713746 P | KR20050122564 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050122564 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007029945 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1922881 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H04N19/34 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/187 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP);
H04N19/91 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/21] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER LEISTUNG BEI DER ENTROPIEKODIERUNG SOWIE VIDEOKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2008/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCING PERFORMANCE OF ENTROPY CODING, VIDEO CODING METHOD AND APPARATUS USING THE METHOD | [2008/21] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL AMELIORANT L'EFFICACITE DU CODAGE ENTROPIQUE, PROCEDE DE CODAGE VIDEO ET APPAREIL UTILISANT LEDIT PROCEDE | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 10.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 24.09.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 30.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - CHOI W ET AL, "The report of CE 3 Improve coding efficiency of entropy coding", 15. JVT MEETING; 72. MPEG MEETING; 16-04-2005 - 22-04-2005; BUSAN, KR;(JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20050421), no. JVT-O021r1, ISSN 0000-0417, XP030005969 [I] 1-37 * points 2 and 3 * * tables 1,3 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "H.264 and MPEG-4 Video Compression, chapter 6, H.264/MPEG4 Part 10, Iain E. Richardson", NOT KNOWN,, (20031017), XP030001626 [A] 1-37 * point 6.4.13.2 * | [X] - CHOI W ET AL, "CE03: CE report coding eff. improvement of CABAC", 16. JVT MEETING; 73. MPEG MEETING; 24-07-2005 - 29-07-2005; POZNAN,PL; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20050726), no. JVT-P067r1, ISSN 0000-0416, XP030006105 [X] 1-37 * points 2 and 3 * | [A] - RIDGE J ET AL, "CE8: CAVLC", 16. JVT MEETING; 73. MPEG MEETING; 24-07-2005 - 29-07-2005; POZNAN,PL; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20050803), no. JVT-P308, ISSN 0000-0416, XP030006164 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * | [XP] - LEE B K, "VLC for 8x8 transform FGS", 17. JVT MEETING; 74. MPEG MEETING; 14-10-2005 - 21-10-2005; NICE, FR;(JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20051011), no. JVT-Q057, ISSN 0000-0413, XP030006218 [XP] 1-37 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6097842 ; | [A]US6351563 ; | [A] - OHM J.-R., "Advances in scalable video coding", PROC. OF THE IEEE, (200501), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 42 - 56, XP011123852 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2004.839611 | [A] - RIDGE J. AND KARCZEWICZ M., "Variable length codes for SVC", JTV-P056, 16TH JVT MEETING PL, (20050724), XP008077615 | Examination | US2003202601 |