EP1943298 - PROCESS FOR THE COATING OF POLYMER PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREMER, Leonardus, Gerardus, Bernardus Clos Robinson 19 B-4600 Vise / BE | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | van der Ploeg, Antonius Franciscus M.J., et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | van der Ploeg, Antonius Franciscus M.J., et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | ||
Former [2008/29] | van der Ploeg, Antonius Franciscus M.J., et al DSM Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 06799468.1 | 26.09.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006NL00479 | Priority number, date | NL20051030033 | 26.09.2005 Original published format: NL 1030033 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007035094 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943298 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943298 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C08J3/20 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
C08J3/203 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/08 (KR);
C08J2300/22 (KR);
C08J2400/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | C08J7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON POLYMERTEILCHEN | [2008/29] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE COATING OF POLYMER PARTICLES | [2008/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT DE PARTICULES POLYMERES | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2006 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | IT | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | ES | 21.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | IE | 26.09.2013 | LU | 26.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
IE | 26.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
IE | 26.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
IE | 26.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4517246 (MATSUYAMA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * examples 1-6 * [A] 3,4,9; | [XA]US4960617 (CHATTERJEE ANANDA M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 4; examples 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 3,4,9; | [A]US5041310 (WILLIAMS JOEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-10* examples I,II *; | [XDA]WO03087198 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-9 | by applicant | WO03087198 |