EP1902424 - Highly constrained image reconstruction method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/13] | BACKPROJECTION RECONSTRUCTION METHOD FOR CT IMAGING | ||
[2009/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION 614 North Walnut Street Madison, WI 53705 / US | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISTRETTA, Charles, A. 843 Farwell Drive Madison, WI 53704 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06800003.3 | 06.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006US26196 | Priority number, date | US20050697607P | 08.07.2005 Original published format: US 697607 P | US20050719445P | 22.09.2005 Original published format: US 719445 P | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007008528 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1902424 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902424 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
G06T11/006 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/037 (EP,US);
A61B6/4441 (EP,US);
A61B6/507 (EP,US);
G01R33/4824 (EP,US);
G01R33/561 (EP,US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildrekonstruktion unter Nebenbedingungen | [2009/23] | English: | Highly constrained image reconstruction method | [2009/23] | French: | Procédé de reconstruction d'images hautement contraint | [2009/23] |
Former [2008/13] | REKONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN FÜR STARK EINGESCHRÄNKTE BILDER | ||
Former [2008/13] | BACKPROJECTION RECONSTRUCTION METHOD FOR CT IMAGING | ||
Former [2008/13] | METHODE DE RECONSTRUCTION TYPE RETROPROJECTION POUR TOMOGRAPHIE PAR ORDINATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.11.2009 | BE | 11.11.2009 | CY | 11.11.2009 | CZ | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | EE | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | LT | 11.11.2009 | LV | 11.11.2009 | PL | 11.11.2009 | RO | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | SI | 11.11.2009 | SK | 11.11.2009 | TR | 11.11.2009 | BG | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | ES | 22.02.2010 | IS | 11.03.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | GB | 06.07.2010 | IE | 06.07.2010 | LU | 06.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
GB | 06.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.07.2010 | ||
LU | 06.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
HU | 12.05.2010 | ||
GB | 06.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
GB | 06.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2009 | ||
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
EE | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
RO | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SK | 11.11.2009 | ||
BG | 11.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
BE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 11.11.2009 | |
CY | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
LT | 11.11.2009 | ||
LV | 11.11.2009 | ||
PL | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SI | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
IS | 11.03.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [PX] - MISTRETTA CA ET AL, "Highly constrained backprojection for time-resolved MRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (20051209), vol. 55, pages 30 - 40, XP002404098 [PX] 1-43 * the whole document * | [X] - SCHMIDLIN P ET AL, "Subsets and overrelaxation in iterative image reconstruction", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY IOP PUBLISHING UK, (199905), vol. 44, no. 5, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 1385 - 1396, XP002405666 [X] 1,14,28 * page 1386, line L - page 1387 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/44/5/321 | [X] - LAUNAY L ET AL, "3D reconstruction of cerebral vessels and pathologies from a few biplane digital angiographies", VISUALIZATION IN BIOMEDICAL COMPUTING. 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, VBC '96 PROCEEDINGS SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (1996), ISBN 3-540-61649-7, pages 123 - 128, XP001247778 [X] 1,14,28 * the whole document * | [X] - CRISTIAN BADEA ET AL, "Experiments with the nonlinear and chaotic behaviour of the multiplicative algebraic reconstruction technique (MART) algorithm for computed tomography", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS LTD. LONDON, GB, (20040421), vol. 49, no. 8, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 1455 - 1474, XP020024084 [X] 1,14,28 * page 1456 - page 1457 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/49/8/006 | Examination | - SHEPP L.A. ET AL, "MAXIMUM LIKELIHOOD RECONSTRUCTION FOR EMISSION TOMOGRAPHY", IEEE TRANS MED IMAGING, (1982), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 113 - 121, XP000877028 |