EP1904910 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DIVIDING A CLOCK SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Feng 5035 E. Stemwood Street Boise, ID 83716 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [2017/48] |
Former [2008/14] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 06800130.4 | 17.07.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006US28045 | Priority number, date | US20050183642 | 18.07.2005 Original published format: US 183642 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007012010 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1904910 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1904910 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/04 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H03K23/44 (EP,US);
H03K23/00 (KR);
G06F1/04 (EP,US);
G06F1/06 (KR);
H03K23/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | G06F1/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/48] |
Former [2009/01] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEILUNG EINES TAKTSIGNALS | [2008/14] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DIVIDING A CLOCK SIGNAL | [2008/14] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DIVISER UN SIGNAL D'HORLOGE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 03.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.11.2017 | [2018/41] | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6166571 (WANG HONGMO [US]) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 26 * * figure 2 * [A] 17-22; | [XA]US6566918 (NGUYEN ANDY T [US]) [X] 17-22 * abstract * * column 1, lines 32-40 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 37 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 1; | [A]US6448831 (HUNT JR BARRY TRAVIS [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6166571 | US6566918 |