EP1909702 - COMPOSITE SELF-COHERED WEB MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWLEY, Jerald, M. 3185 S. Debbie St. Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | 02 /
FARNSWORTH, Ted, R. 628 N,_Pine Cliff Dr. Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | 03 /
FLYNN, Charles 1401 N. Fourth straat 256 Flagstaff, AZ 86004 / US | 04 /
WHITE, Charles, F. 603 Azure Drive Camp Verde, AZ 86322 / US | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
CRAWLEY, Jerald, M. 3185 S. Debbie St. Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | ||
02 /
FARNSWORTH, Ted, R. 628 N,_Pine Cliff Dr. Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | |||
03 /
FLYNN, Charles 2600 N. Valley View Rd., 111 Flagstaff, AZ 86004 / US | |||
04 /
WHITE, Charles, F. 603 Azure Drive Camp Verde, AZ 86322 / US | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06800222.9 | 21.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US28456 | Priority number, date | US20050193090 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: US 193090 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007015974 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909702 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/28 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP);
A61L31/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTZUSAMMENGEHALTENE VERBUNDBAHNMATERIALIEN | [2008/16] | English: | COMPOSITE SELF-COHERED WEB MATERIALS | [2008/16] | French: | MATERIAUX EN BANDE INTERCOLLES COMPOSITES | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 28.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/18] | 05.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3047444 (HARWOOD KENNETH J) [A] 1-16 * column 4, lines 13-16 *; | [A]WO0032749 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 * * figure 12 ** examples 1,6 *; | [X]US6309423 (HAYES BYRON K [US]) [X] 1-16 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]US6514292 (ATALA ANTHONY [US]) [A] 1-16 * example 1 *; | [A]US2003082977 (KUROIWA YUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004126405 (SAHATJIAN RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6309423 (HAYES BYRON K [US]); | [Y]US6759431 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA], et al); | [A]US6896687 (DAKOV PEPI [US]) |