EP1909812 - SMALL COMPOUNDS THAT CORRECT PROTEIN MISFOLDING AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall University of Florida PO Box 115500 Gainesville, FL 32611-5500 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUSHAL, Shalesh 6205 NW 81st Drive Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | 02 /
NOORWEZ, Syed, Mohammed 3461 S.W. 2nd Ave. No. 252 Gainesville, FL 32607 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Grund, Martin, et al GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06800453.0 | 27.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US29402 | Priority number, date | US20050703068P | 27.07.2005 Original published format: US 703068 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007014327 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909812 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61P27/06, A61P25/02, A61P27/02, A61K33/02, A61K31/395, A61K31/445, A61P11/00, A61P13/02, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P35/00 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/11 (EP,US);
A61K31/21 (KR);
A61K31/047 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/223 (EP,US);
A61K31/225 (KR);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/395 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61K31/473 (EP,US);
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K33/02 (EP,US);
A61K38/04 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/11, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/16, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/223, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/365, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/395, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/473, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2008/16] | A61K38/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | KLEINE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR KORREKTUR VON PROTEIN-MISSFALTUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2008/16] | English: | SMALL COMPOUNDS THAT CORRECT PROTEIN MISFOLDING AND USES THEREOF | [2008/16] | French: | PETITS COMPOSES CORRIGEANT UN MAUVAIS REPLIEMENT DES PROTEINES ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 02.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | EP11169183.8 / EP2374451 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004092431 (HELLBERG PEGGY E [US]) [A] * page 2, paragraph 9 * * page 3; claim 1 ** page 4; claim 4 *; | [XY] - INDEN M ET AL, "Proteasome inhibitors protect against degeneration of nigral dopaminergic neurons in hemiparkinsonian rats", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (20050101), vol. 97, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 203 - 211, XP003016157 [X] 1,5,11,12 * abstract * * page 205, column LEFT * * page 210, column RIGHT * [Y] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/jphs.FP0040525 | [Y] - NOORWEZ ET AL, "Pharmacological chaperone-mediated in vivo folding and stabilization of the P23H-opsin mutant associated with autosomal dominant retinitis pigmentosa", JBC PAPERS IN PRESS, XX, XX, (20030101), vol. 278, no. 16, pages 14442 - 14450, XP008103178 [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 14442 * * page 14450 * | [Y] - NOORWEZ ET AL, "Retinoids assist the cellular folding of the autosomal dominant retinitis pigmentosa opsin mutant P23H", JBC PAPERS IN PRESS, XX, XX, (20040401), vol. 279, no. 16, pages 16278 - 16284, XP008103188 [Y] 6 * page 16278 * * page 16282, column LEFT * * page 16283, column RIGHT * | [A] - ILLING MICHELLE E ET AL, "A rhodopsin mutant linked to autosomal dominant retinitis pigmentosa is prone to aggregate and interacts with the ubiquitin proteasome system.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 13 SEP 2002, (20020913), vol. 277, no. 37, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 34150 - 34160, XP002549069 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M204955200 | International search | [Y]GB890638 (ALBERT B CHATZINOFF, et al); | [Y]US3196078 (CHATZINOFF ALBERT B, et al); | [X]US5112607 (HUDSON THOMAS H [US], et al); | [X]CA1321356 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [CA]); | [X]WO9825573 (NEUROCAL INTERNATIONAL [US]); | [X]WO0149290 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al); | [X]US2002086015 (GOLD BRUCE G [US]); | [X]US2004220267 (DEVLIN J P [US]); | [XP]US2006121039 (SHARIF NAJAM A [US]); | [XP]WO2006078774 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [Y] - SALIBA ET AL., "The cellular fate of mutant rhodopsin: quality control, degradation and aggresome formation", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 115, pages 2907 - 2918, XP008125346 | [X] - BERGMANN ET AL., "Inhibition of the ATP-driven proton pump in RPE lysosomes by the major lipofuscin fluorophore A2-E may contribute to the pathogenesis of age-related macular degeneration", THE FASEB JOURNAL, (2004), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 562 - 564, XP008130763 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.03-0289fje | Examination | JPH1036289 |