EP2005271 - COMPUTER-OPERATED LANDSCAPE IRRIGATION AND LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Toro Company 8111 Lyndale Avenue South Bloomington, MN 55420-1196 / US | For all designated states Palmer, Doug 1310 Elizabeth Street Redlands, CA 92373 / US | For all designated states Korol, Alex 906 Sunnyhill Place Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMER, Doug 1310 Elizabeth Street Redlands CA 92373 / US | 02 /
KOROL, Alex 906 Sunnyhill Place Diamond Bar CA 91765 / US | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Krahbichler, Erik, et al Krahbichler Intellectual Property Advisors AB - KIPA P.O. Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Krahbichler, Erik, et al Krahbichler Intellectual Property Advisors AB - KIPA P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Krahbichler, Erik Krahbichler Intellectual Property Advisors AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06800612.1 | 31.07.2006 | [2008/52] | WO2006US29947 | Priority number, date | US20050729612P | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 729612 P | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007050175 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2005271 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/00 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
A01G25/16 (EP,US);
H05B47/16 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERBETRIEBENES LANDSCHAFTSBEWÄSSERUNGS- UND BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/52] | English: | COMPUTER-OPERATED LANDSCAPE IRRIGATION AND LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2008/52] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE ET D'IRRIGATION DU PAYSAGE ACTIONNE PAR UN ORDINATEUR | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002002425 (DOSSEY JAMES F [US], et al); | [X]US2003093159 (SIEMINSKI JAMES [US]) |