EP1913492 - PROBABILISTIC RETROSPECTIVE EVENT DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhiwei Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
LI, Mingjing One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MA, Wei-Ying One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
LI, Zhiwei c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
02 /
LI, Mingjing One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
MA, Wei-Ying One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | |||
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
LI, Zhiwei One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
LI, Mingjing One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
MA, Wei-Ying One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801140.2 | 10.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006US31194 | Priority number, date | US20050707009P | 10.08.2005 Original published format: US 707009 P | US20050256353 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: US 256353 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007021837 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913492 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/30 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G06F16/3346 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F16/3344 (EP,US);
G06F7/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | PROBABILISTISCHE RETROSPEKTIVE EREIGNISERFASSUNG | [2008/17] | English: | PROBABILISTIC RETROSPECTIVE EVENT DETECTION | [2008/17] | French: | DETECTION PROBABILISTE RETROSPECTIVE D'EVENEMENTS | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 10.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005021324 (BRANTS THORSTEN H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0112] *; | [A]US2005021490 (CHEN FRANCINE R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0112] ** claim - *; | [XAI] - Satoshi Morinaga ET AL, "Tracking dynamics of Topic Trends Using a Finite Mixture Model", KDD'04 (Proceedings of the tenth ACM SIGKDD international conference on Knowledge discovery and data mining), New York, NY, USA, doi:10.1145/1014052.1016919, ISBN 978-1-58-113888-7, (20040822), pages 811 - 816, URL: http://wing.comp.nus.edu.sg/downloads/keyphraseCorpus/199/199.pdf, (20120203), XP055018350 [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [A] 8-20 [I] 2,3,5-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1014052.1016919 | [A] - Shi Zhong ET AL, "A Comparative Study of Generative Models for Document Clustering", SIAM Int. Conf. Data Mining Workshop on Clustering High Dimensional Data and Its Applications, doi:10.1.1.8.4583, (20030101), URL: http://www.ideal.ece.utexas.edu/pdfs/113.pdf, (20120203), XP055018391 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1.1.8.4583 | [A] - IVÃ N OLIER ET AL, Comparative Assessment of the Robustness of Missing Data Imputation Through Generative Topographic Mapping, COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE AND BIOINSPIRED SYSTEMS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 787 - 794, (20050618), ISBN 978-3-540-26208-4, XP019010352 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11494669_96 | International search | [A]US5325298 (GALLANT STEPHEN I [US]); | [A]US5488725 (TURTLE HOWARD R [US], et al); | [A]US6405188 (SCHWARTZ RICHARD M [US], et al); | [A]US6925433 (STENSMO JAN MAGNUS [US]) | by applicant | - SATOSHI MORINAGA ET AL., "Tracking dynamics of topic trend using a finite mixture model", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY AND DATA MINING, (20040822), doi:doi:10.1145/1014052.1016919, pages 811 - 816, XP058234505 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1014052.1016919 |