EP1940484 - CONTROLLED RADICAL POLYMERIZATION-DERIVED BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS FOR MEDICAL DEVICE COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. IP Legal Department 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Mingfei 5763 Owl Hill Avenue Santa Rosa, California 95409 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Peiwen 366 Breeden Street Santa Rosa, California 95409 / US | 03 /
UDIPI, Kishore 3575 Alkirst Court Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
CHEN, Mingfei 228 South Boas Drive Santa Rosa, California 95409 / US | ||
02 /
CHENG, Peiwen 366 Breeden Street Santa Rosa, California 95409 / US | |||
03 /
UDIPI, Kishore 3575 Alkirst Court Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801202.0 | 09.08.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US31289 | Priority number, date | US20050711800P | 25.08.2005 Original published format: US 711800 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007024500 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940484 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/10, A61L31/16, C08F293/00, C09D153/00 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
C08F293/005 (EP,US);
C09D153/00 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
C08F2438/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | DURCH KONTROLLIERTE RADIKALE POLYMERISATION GEWONNENE BLOCKCOPOLYMER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR ÜBERZÜGE FÜR MEDIZINPRODUKTE | [2008/28] | English: | CONTROLLED RADICAL POLYMERIZATION-DERIVED BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS FOR MEDICAL DEVICE COATINGS | [2008/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE COPOLYMERES SEQUENCES DERIVES D'UNE POLYMERISATION RADIALE COMMANDEE DESTINEES A DES REVETEMENTS DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 24.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2015 | 21.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/16] | 01.12.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/16] | 17.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005011767 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,11-24 * triblock copolymer 1; paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0098]; claims 1,10,14 * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0089] *; | [X]US2005107531 (CLAUDE CHARLES D [US]) [X] 1,11-14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0032] , [0035]; claim - *; | [PX]WO2006014607 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,11-24 * figures 3-5; example 2; claim - *; | [X] - RICHARD ET AL, "EVALUATION OF ACRYLATE-BASED BLOCK COPOLYMERS PREPARED BY ATOM TRANSFER RADICAL POLYMERIZATION AS MATRICES FOR PACLITAXEL DELIVERY FROM CORONARY STENTS", PAPERS PRESENTED AT THE MEETING - AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. DIVISION OF POLYMER CHEMISTRY, XX, XX, (20050726), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0032-3934, pages 235 - 236, XP001248296 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [PX] - RICHARD ROBERT E ET AL, "Evaluation of acrylate-based block copolymers prepared by atom transfer radical polymerization as matrices for paclitaxel delivery from coronary stents.", BIOMACROMOLECULES. 2005 NOV-DEC, (20051028), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 3410 - 3418, XP002411948 [PX] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm050464v |