EP1919490 - MEDICINAL HERBAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Patent Holdings LLC c/o AMS Trustees (Nevis) P.O. Box 733 Springates South Governmahent Road Charlestown / KN | [2009/38] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states International Patent Holdings, Ltd. Reid House, 31 Church Street P.O. Box HM 1564 Hamilton HMFX / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIPRONO CHEPKWONY, Paul P.O. Box 7321 Eldoret / KE | 02 /
MEDINA, Maria P.O. Box 665 - Village Market Nairobi / KE | 03 /
MEDINA, Mitchell P.O. Box 665 - Village Market Nairobi / KE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Riebling, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801240.0 | 11.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006US31355 | Priority number, date | US20050710237P | 22.08.2005 Original published format: US 710237 P | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007024510 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1919490 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1919490 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
A61K36/38 (EP,US);
A61K36/47 (EP,US);
A61K36/76 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/38, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/47, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/76, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE PFLANZLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFEKTIONEN | [2008/20] | English: | MEDICINAL HERBAL COMPOSITION FOR TREATING INFECTION | [2008/20] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE D'HERBES MEDICINALES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS | [2008/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 01.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2013 | 26.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.08.2006 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BE | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | ES | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | IT | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | MC | 03.12.2014 | NL | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | IE | 11.08.2015 | LU | 11.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 11.08.2015 | ||
LU | 11.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
MC | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ANONYMOUS, "Alkaloid extraction from Acacia bark and phyllodes", (20010201), URL: http://www.lycaeum.org/~mulga/acacia/extract.html, (20100308), XP002572220 [I] 9-20 * the whole document * | [I] - MADMAX, "Recrystallization and Acid/Base Extraction", (20020701), URL: http://designer-drugs.com/pte/12.162.180.114/dcd/chemistry/equipment/rextal.a-b.basics.html, (20100308), XP002572221 [I] 9-20 * the whole document * | [A] - Lindsay, R.S. and Hepper, F.N., "Medicinal plants of Marakwet, Kenya", Kew, Royal Botanic Gardens Kew, (1978), pages 1 - 29, XP009130552 [A] 1-38 * pages 8, 16 and 29 * | [A] - RAHMAN, M.A. ET AL., "Medicinal plant diversity in the flora of Saudi Arabia1: a report on seven plant families", FITOTERAPIA, (200403), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 149 - 161, XP007912093 [A] 1-38 * page 154 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fitote.2003.12.012 | International search | [Y]US5989556 (TSAI HSIU-HSIEN [TW], et al); | [Y] - GEYID ET AL., "Screening of some medicinal plants of Ethiopia for their anti-microbial properties and chemical profiles", J. ETHNOPHARMACOL., (20050321), vol. 97, no. 3, pages 421 - 427, XP025270152 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2004.08.021 | [Y] - VECCHIATO, "Sociocultural Aspects of Tuberculosis Control in Ethiopia", MEDICAL ANTHROPOLOGY QUARTERLY, (199706), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 183 - 201, XP008125359 | [Y] - DE BOER ET AL., "Anti-fungal and anti-bacterial activity of some herbal remedies from Tanzania", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (2005), vol. 96, pages 461 - 469, XP025269717 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2004.09.035 | [Y] - BALDASCINI, "Income generating opportunities arising from natural ecoystems in Uganda: an overview", THE INTERNATIONAL FOOD POLICY RESEARCH INSTITUTE, (200203), pages 1 - 39, XP009130349 | [Y] - ASRES ET AL., "Antiviral activity against human immunodeficiency virus type 1 (HIV-1) and type 2 (HIV-2) of ethnobotanically selected Ethiopian medicinal plants", PHYTOTHERPAY RESEARCH, (20010126), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 62 - 69, XP008125360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1099-1573(200102)15 | [Y] - GIDAY, "An ethnobotanical study of medicinal plants used by the Zay people in Ethiopia", CBMS: A SKRIFTSERIA, (2001), vol. 1, pages 81 - 99, XP008130778 | [Y] - KRAFT ET AL., "In vitro antiplasmodial evaluation of medicinal plants from Zimbabwe", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, (20030210), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 123 - 128, XP009057941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.1066 | [Y] - MULHOLLAND ET AL., "The Chemistry of the Meliaceae and Ptaeroxylaceae of Southern and Eastern Africa and Madagascar", CURRENT ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 4, pages 1011 - 1054, XP008130779 | [Y] - ELOFF, "Which extractant should be used for the screening and isolation of antimicrobial components from plants?", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (199802), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 1 - 8, XP008125361 | [Y] - YAMADA, "A REPORT ON THE ETHNOBOTANY OF THE NYINDU IN THE EASTERN PART OF THE FORMER ZAIRE", AFRICAN STUDY MONOGRAPHS, (199906), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 1 - 72, XP008130780 | [Y] - COS ET AL., "Further evaluation of Rwandan medicinal plant extracts for their antimicrobial and antiviral activities", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (200202), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 155 - 163, XP008125362 | [Y] - VERSCHAEVE ET AL., "Investigation of the antimutagenic effects of selected South African medicinal plant extracts", TOXICOLOGY IN VITRO, (200402), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 29 - 35, XP008125363 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/s0887-2333(03)00131-0 | [Y] - CUI ET AL., "Clinical efficacy of compound periploca liquid in treating condyloma acuminatum and its effect on human papilloma virus DNA expression in vitro", ZHONGGUO ZHONG XI YI JIE HE ZA ZHI, (200505), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 392 - 396 |