EP1928672 - TIRE WITH REINFORCED BEAD/SIDEWALL DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC 535 Marriott Drive Nashville, TN 37214 / US | [2009/43] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Bridgestone/Firestone North American Tire, LLC 535 Marriott Drive Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Jie 271 Alexander Court Copley, Ohio 44321 / US | 02 /
CRANO, Michael 193 Townes End Drive Wadsworth, OH 44281 / US | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801463.8 | 15.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006US31719 | Priority number, date | US20050217738 | 01.09.2005 Original published format: US 217738 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007030284 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1928672 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1928672 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/09, B60C15/00, B60C9/02 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
B60C15/0018 (EP,US);
B60C15/0607 (EP,US);
B60C17/0009 (EP,US);
B60C9/02 (EP,US);
B60C9/09 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10864 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/39] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT VERSTÄRKTEM WULST/VERSTÄRKTER SEITENWANDAUSFÜHRUNG | [2008/24] | English: | TIRE WITH REINFORCED BEAD/SIDEWALL DESIGN | [2008/24] | French: | PNEU AVEC UNE CONCEPTION À TALON RENFORCÉ/PAROI LATÉRALE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 02.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10008694.1 / EP2258565 | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4177852 (FRANCIA CARLO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12,13 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 30; figures 2,5-7,9,11; claim 1 *; | [X]JPS5893605 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1,8-13* abstract *; | [X]US4585045 (MORIKAWA TUNEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8-13 * column 6, lines 5-12; figures 4-8 *; | [XY]EP0595653 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1,8-13 * column 6, lines 12-36; figure 3 * [Y] 2,3,5,6; | [Y]WO9853981 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 2,3,5,6 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]EP0890454 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1,8-13 * column 4, lines 25-27; figure 3 * |