EP1971362 - EXENDIN FOR TREATING DIABETES AND REDUCING BODY WEIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC 9360 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | For all designated states AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE / US | [2014/49] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Amylin Pharmaceuticals, LLC 9360 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP 1800 Concorde Pike Wilmington, DE / US | |||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 9360 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINEMAN, Mark 9360 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
MACCONELL, Leigh 9360 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
TAYLOR, Kristin 9360 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/11] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06801867.0 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US32354 | Priority number, date | US20050709604P | 19.08.2005 Original published format: US 709604 P | US20060779216P | 03.03.2006 Original published format: US 779216 P | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007024700 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1971362 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1971362 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, A61K9/00, A61P3/10, A61P3/04 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/46 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Extension states | AL | 13.03.2008 | BA | 13.03.2008 | HR | 13.03.2008 | MK | 13.03.2008 | RS | 13.03.2008 | Title | German: | EXENDIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES UND ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES KÖRPERGEWICHTS | [2008/39] | English: | EXENDIN FOR TREATING DIABETES AND REDUCING BODY WEIGHT | [2008/39] | French: | EXENDIN POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE ET LA REDUCTION DE POIDS CORPOREL | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2014 | Observations by third parties | 31.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.04.2014 | 03.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10016112.4 / EP2347762 | EP19163698.4 / EP3524261 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. 153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP, et al, et al 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | 02
02.09.2015
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Wilson, Lynn Margaret, et al, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | 03
02.09.2015
09.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2 Abrunheira 2710-089 Sintra / PT Opponent's representative Weist, Stefan, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | 04
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE COOLEY LLP 3175 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130 / US Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | 05
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 06
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [2021/47] |
Former [2021/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. 153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP, et al, et al 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
02
02.09.2015
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Wilson, Lynn Margaret, et al, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
03
02.09.2015
09.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2 Abrunheira 2710-089 Sintra / PT Opponent's representative Weist, Stefan, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
04
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE COOLEY LLP 3175 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130 / US Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | |||
05
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
06
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street Petach Tikva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. 153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP, et al, et al 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
02
02.09.2015
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Wilson, Lynn Margaret, et al, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
03
02.09.2015
09.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2 Abrunheira 2710-089 Sintra / PT Opponent's representative Weist, Stefan, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
04
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE COOLEY LLP 3175 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130 / US Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | |||
05
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB Opponent's representative Elkington & Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
06
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street Petach Tikva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2018/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. 153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP, et al, et al 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
02
02.09.2015
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Wilson, Lynn Margaret, et al, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
03
02.09.2015
09.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2 Abrunheira 2710-089 Sintra / PT Opponent's representative Weist, Stefan, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
04
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE COOLEY LLP 3175 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130 / US Opponent's representative Walton, Seán Malcolm Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | |||
05
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB Opponent's representative Elkington & Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
06
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street Petach Tikva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. GR-153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP, et al, et al 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
02
02.09.2015
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Wilson, Lynn Margaret, et al, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
03
02.09.2015
09.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2 Abrunheira 2710-089 Sintra / PT Opponent's representative Weist, Stefan, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
04
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE COOLEY LLP 3175 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130 / US Opponent's representative Walton, Seán Malcolm Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | |||
05
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB Opponent's representative Cooke, Richard Spencer Elkington and Fife LLP Patents Department 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | |||
06
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street Petach Tikva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. GR-153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Brown, Andrew Stephen, et al, et al Pharmathen 44 Kifissias Avenue 15125 Maroussi, Athens / GR | ||
02
02.09.2015
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Wilson, Lynn Margaret, et al, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
03
02.09.2015
09.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2 Abrunheira 2710-089 Sintra / PT Opponent's representative Weist, Stefan, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
04
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE COOLEY LLP 3175 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1130 / US Opponent's representative Walton, Seán Malcolm Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | |||
05
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB Opponent's representative Cooke, Richard Spencer Elkington and Fife LLP Patents Department 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | |||
06
03.09.2015
14.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street Petach Tikva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Kalhammer, Georg Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. GR-153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Brown, Andrew Stephen, et al, et al Pharmathen 44 Kifissias Avenue 15125 Maroussi, Athens / GR | ||
02
02.09.2015
08.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB Opponent's representative Wilson, Lynn Margaret, et al, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | |||
03
02.09.2015
09.09.2015
ADMISSIBLE PENTAFARMA, Sociedade Técnico-Medicinal, SA Rua da Tapada Grande, n° 2 Abrunheira 2710-089 Sintra / PT Opponent's representative Weist, Stefan, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2015
27.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE PHARMATHEN S.A. 6, Dervenakion Str. GR-153 51 Pallini Attikis / GR Opponent's representative Brown, Andrew Stephen, et al, et al Pharmathen 44 Kifissias Avenue 15125 Maroussi, Athens / GR | 13.10.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.04.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.10.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/32] | Appeal following opposition | 06.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T1996/17 | 16.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 11.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.08.2016 | [2017/23] |
Former [2016/50] | deleted | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 18.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005041873 (AZOPAX THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-133 * claims 18,26,31-33 *; | [A]US6924264 (PRICKETT KATHRYN S [US], et al) [A] 96-106 * abstract *; | [PX]WO2005102293 (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-133* abstract *; | [X] - GEDULIN B R ET AL, "Dose-response for glycaemic and metabolic changes 28 days after single injection of long-acting release exenatide in diabetic fatty Zucker rats.", DIABETOLOGIA JUL 2005, (200507), vol. 48, no. 7, ISSN 0012-186X, pages 1380 - 1385, XP002431948 [X] 1-133 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-005-1795-2 | [X] - "EXENATIDE: AC 2993, AC002993, AC2993A, EXENDIN 4, LY2148568", DRUGS IN R & D, ADIS INTERNATIONAL, AUCKLAND, NZ, (2004), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1174-5886, pages 35 - 40, XP009083108 [X] 1-133 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00126839-200405010-00007 | [X] - BUSE JOHN B ET AL, "Effects of exenatide (exendin-4) on glycemic control over 30 weeks in sulfonylurea-treated patients with type 2 diabetes.", DIABETES CARE NOV 2004, (200411), vol. 27, no. 11, ISSN 0149-5992, pages 2628 - 2635, XP002431949 [X] 1-133 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diacare.27.11.2628 | [A] - AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS PRESS RELEASES, "Exenatide LAR data support initiation of phase 2 multi-dose study in 2005", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20041102), URL: www.amylin.com, (20070502), XP002431950 [A] 1-133 * the whole document * | other | US2004228833 | - TAYLOR K. ET AL, "Continuous subcutaneous infusion of AC2993 (synthetic exendin-4) provides sustained day-long glycemic control in patients with Type 2 diabetes", EASD ANNUAL MEETING BUDAPEST, (20020903), vol. 38TH, page 4, XP003033268 | - WEI X.J. ET AL, "Clinical Pharmacology and Biopharmaceutics Review(s)", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS REVIEW(S). CENTER FOR DRUG EVALUATION AND RESEARCH, (20050804), pages 1 - 163, XP003033267 |