EP1917544 - HIGH ACCURACY SURVEY-GRADE GIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.A. Smith & Associates, Inc. 16745 West Bluemound Road, Suite 200 Brookfield WI 53005 / US | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Robert S. W315 S454 Christopher Way Delafield, Wisconsin 53018 / US | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06802114.6 | 22.08.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006US32835 | Priority number, date | US20050710574P | 23.08.2005 Original published format: US 710574 P | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007024892 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1917544 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/38 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
G06T17/05 (EP,US);
G01C15/00 (EP,US);
G01S19/04 (EP,US);
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06T3/02 (EP,US);
G06T2219/2016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | HOCHPRÄZISES VERMESSUNGS-GIS-SYSTEM | [2008/19] | English: | HIGH ACCURACY SURVEY-GRADE GIS SYSTEM | [2008/19] | French: | SYSTEME D'INFORMATIONS GEOGRAPHIQUES (GIS) A RELEVES HAUTE PRECISION AU NIVEAU DU SOL | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 26.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.09.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5414462 (VEATCH JOHN W [US]); | [Y]US2001033290 (SCOTT DAN MARTIN [US], et al); | [Y] - "ArcGIS Survey Analyst concepts.", ESRI TECHNICAL PAPER, REDLANDS, CA, (200210), URL: http://downloads.esn.com/support/extensions/ArcGIS%20Survey%20Analyst/Survey_analyst_concepts.pdf, (20070710), XP008130789 |