EP1937418 - METHOD OF ATTACHING AN ANTIMICROBIAL CATIONIC POLYELECTROLYTE TO THE SURFACE OF SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quick-Med Technologies, Inc. 902 NW 4th Street Gainesville, FL 32601 / US | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. P.O. Box 115500 Gainesville Florida 32611-5500 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Quick-Med Technologies, Inc. 902 NW 4th Street Gainesville FL 32601 / US | ||
For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. P.O. Box 115500 Gainesville Florida 32611-5500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOREKI, William 902 NW Fourth Street Gainesville, FL 32601-4285 / US | 02 /
LIESENFELD, Bernd 4415 Northwest 70th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32608-8209 / US | 03 /
MOORE, David 902 NW Fourth Street Gainesville, FL 32601-4285 / US | 04 /
LEANDER, Susan 902 NW Fourth Street Gainesville, FL 32601-4285 / US | 05 /
BATICH, Christopher 3733 Northwest 40th Street Gainesville, FL 32606 / US | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
TOREKI, William 3427 Southwest 42nd Way Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | ||
02 /
LIESENFELD, Bernd 4415 Northwest 70th Terrace Gainesville, FL 32608-8209 / US | |||
03 /
MOORE, David 3427 Southwest 42nd Way Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | |||
04 /
LEANDER, Susan 3427 Southwest 42nd Way Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | |||
05 /
BATICH, Christopher 3733 Northwest 40th Street Gainesville, FL 32606 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2018/30] |
Former [2011/44] | Gosnall, Toby, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Gibson, Mark, et al Barker Brettell LLP St. John's Innovation Centre Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WS / GB | Application number, filing date | 06802188.0 | 22.08.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US32955 | Priority number, date | US20050710127P | 22.08.2005 Original published format: US 710127 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007024974 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1937418 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937418 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N33/12, A61L15/46, A61L2/232, A61L2/18 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
A01N33/12 (EP,BR,US);
A01N25/10 (BR);
A01N25/24 (BR);
A01N37/12 (EP,BR,US);
A61L15/46 (EP,BR,US);
A61L2/18 (EP,BR,US);
A61L2/232 (EP,BR,US);
A01N2300/00 (BR);
A61L2300/208 (EP,BR,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N33/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N33/12, A01N25/10, A01N25/24, A01N25/34 (EP,US);
A01N37/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/12, A01N25/10, A01N25/24, A01N25/34 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/27] | B05D7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES ANTIMIKROBIELLEN KATIONISCHEN POLYELEKTROLYTEN AN DER FLÄCHE EINES SUBSTRATS | [2008/27] | English: | METHOD OF ATTACHING AN ANTIMICROBIAL CATIONIC POLYELECTROLYTE TO THE SURFACE OF SUBSTRATE | [2008/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE FIXATION D'UN POLYELECTROLYTE CATIONIQUE ANTIMICROBIEN A LA SURFACE D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 06.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2009 | 31.08.2015 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2006 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 22.08.2018 | LU | 22.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.08.2006 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.08.2006 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5658915 (ABE KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002177828 (BATICH CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [X] 1-17* example 1 *; | [XP]WO2005084436 (QUICK MED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-17 * examples 1,3-8 * | International search | [X]WO2004076770 (QUICK MED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) | by applicant | - MICHELLE WALLACE, AATCC Review, (20011100), pages 18 - 20 |