EP1931734 - POLYETHYLENE MODIFIED ASPHALT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyglass USA, Inc. 555 Oakridge Road Humboldt Industrial Park (SW) Hazelton PA 18202 / US | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANCHETTA, Natalino 4475 Mountain Gate Drive Reno, NV 89509 / US | 02 /
DRIGO, Michele Via Borgo Fiure I-31100 Treviso XX / IT | 03 /
MOHSEEN, Shaik 15704 Echo Hills Drive Austin, Texas 78717 / US | [2009/18] |
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
ZANCHETTA, Natalino 4475 Mountain Gate Drive Reno, NV 89509 / US | ||
02 /
DRIGO, Michele Via Borgo Fiure I-31100 Treviso XX / IT | |||
03 /
MOHSEEN, Shaik 3 Diane Court Mountain Top, PA 18707 / US | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio, et al Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Minoja, Fabrizio, et al Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/25] | Pistolesi, Roberto, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Marina 6 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06802962.8 | 06.09.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006US34538 | Priority number, date | US20050220741 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 220741 | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007030448 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1931734 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04D5/00, E04D5/08, B32B11/00, C08L23/08, C08L91/00, E04D5/10, E04D11/02, C08L95/00 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L2555/60 (EP,US);
C08L2555/86 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L23/06, C08L2205/025, C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L95/00, C08L23/00 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L23/08 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/06 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2008/45] | E04D5/00, E04D5/08, B32B11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/25] | C08L95/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENMODIFIZIERTE ASPHALTMASSEN | [2008/25] | English: | POLYETHYLENE MODIFIED ASPHALT COMPOSITIONS | [2008/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ASPHALTE MODIFIEES PAR POLYETHYLENE | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 30.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.03.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4868233 (MORAN LYLE E [CA]) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [XYI]EP0545196 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-18 [I] 2-14,16-24; | [XYI]EP0593859 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-24 [I] 2-14,16-24; | [XYI]US5366779 (THOMPSON ANDREW [GB]) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-24 [I] 2-14,16-24; | [XYI]EP0667374 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) [X] 15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-24 [I] 1-14,16-24; | [Y]US5708061 (HESP SIMON [CA], et al) [Y] 1-24* the whole document *; | [XY]WO03014492 (ELK PREMIUM BUILDING PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * claims 1,42,53 * [Y] 1-24; | [XY]US2004055240 (KIIK MATTI [US], et al) [X] 15 * claims 17,23 * [Y] 1-24; | [A] - Joann A. Wess ET AL, "Asphalt (Bitumen); Concise International Chemical Assessment Document 59", Geneva, Switzerland, (20040101), pages 1 - 56, URL: http://www.who.int/ipcs/publications/cicad/cicad59_rev_1.pdf, (20121023), XP055041926 [A] 1-24 * table 1 * | [XYI] - Ali Akbar Yousefi, "Rubber-polyethylene Modified Bitumens", Iranian Polymer Journal, Vol 13(2), (20040101), pages 101 - 112, URL: journal.ippi.ac.ir/manuscripts/ipjE04130203.pdf, (20121024), XP055042037 [X] 15 * table 6 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-24 [I] 1-14,16-24 | International search | [Y]US4868233 (MORAN LYLE E [CA]); | [Y]US5708061 (HESP SIMON [CA], et al) |