EP1927057 - NAVIGATION OF STRUCTURED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, James One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
BUCKLEY, Jamie One Microsoft Way Redmnd WA 98052 / US | 03 /
SOLARO, John Albert One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | 04 /
BALDWIN, Laura One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | 05 /
KERN, Randall Friend One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | 06 /
CUCERZAN, Silviu-Petru One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06802992.5 | 05.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006US34611 | Priority number, date | US20050233164 | 22.09.2005 Original published format: US 233164 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037925 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927057 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/30, G06Q90/00 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
G06F16/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATION STRUKTURIERTER DATEN | [2008/23] | English: | NAVIGATION OF STRUCTURED DATA | [2008/23] | French: | NAVIGATION DANS DES DONNEES STRUCTUREES | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 02.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03005235 (COGISUM INTERMEDIA AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO03054859 (MUREX SECURITIES LTD [GB], et al); | [A]EP1282060 (OVERTURE SERVICES INC [US]) |