EP1934706 - MODULAR AGENT ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autonomic Software, Inc. 390 Diablo Road, Nr. 230 Danville, CA 94526 / US | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RILEY, Ryan 2150 North Hickory Way Meridian, ID 83642 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06803293.7 | 08.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006US35214 | Priority number, date | US20050223906 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: US 223906 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007030798 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1934706 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G06F9/44526 (EP,US);
G06F9/44521 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | G06F7/04, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | MODULARE AGENT-ARCHITEKTUR | [2008/26] | English: | MODULAR AGENT ARCHITECTURE | [2008/26] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'AGENTS MODULAIRES | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2010 | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003177389 (ALBERT ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] ** paragraph [0077] * | International search | [X]US2003177389 (ALBERT ANTHONY [US], et al) |