EP1937286 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING DIMETHYL SULFOXIDE (DMSO) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abela Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 25181 Midcrest Drive Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [2016/10] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Abela Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 25181 Midcrest Drive Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LA TORRE, Jack 3416 80th Ave., Ct. NW Gig Harbor, Washington 98335 / US | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Rees, Kerry WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Rees, Kerry WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06803336.4 | 11.09.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US35320 | Priority number, date | US20050716335P | 12.09.2005 Original published format: US 716335 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007033082 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1937286 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937286 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/14, A61K31/198, A61K31/10, A61K31/17, A61P25/28 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/17 (EP,US);
A61K31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/10, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/17, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | A61K33/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS DIMETHYLSULFOXID (DMSO) | [2008/27] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING DIMETHYL SULFOXIDE (DMSO) | [2008/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DU DIMÉTHYLSULFOXYDE (DMSO) | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11154666.9 / EP2324838 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2006 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | ES | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | IT | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | IE | 11.09.2016 | LU | 11.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | FR | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.09.2006 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 11.09.2016 | ||
LU | 11.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 11.09.2016 | ||
LU | 11.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 11.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
IT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
ES | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0827744 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, lines 30,56 * * column 2, lines 46-49 *; | [Y]WO03015760 (HADASIT MED RES SERVICE [IL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 12, paragraphs 4,5; claim 1 *; | [YD] - CHERIAN LEELA ET AL, "L-arginine and free radical scavengers increase cerebral blood flow and brain tissue nitric oxide concentrations after controlled cortical impact injury in rats.", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA, (200301), vol. 20, no. 1, ISSN 0897-7151, pages 77 - 85, XP009106134 [YD] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/08977150360517209 | [Y] - KUBOTA M ET AL, "Beneficial effect of l-arginine for stroke-like episode in MELAS", BRAIN AND DEVELOPMENT, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041001), vol. 26, no. 7, ISSN 0387-7604, pages 481 - 483, XP004692525 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.braindev.2004.01.006 | [Y] - ROBERTSON C S ET AL, "L-arginine reduces neuronal damage after traumatic brain injury in the mouse", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA, & EIGHTEENTH ANNUAL NATIONAL NEUROTRAUMA SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM; NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA; NOVEMBER 03-04, 2000, (200010), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 0897-7151, page 945, XP009106221 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4296104 (HERSCHLER ROBERT J); | [X]US2005031651 (GERVAIS FRANCINE [CA], et al); | [X]US6479488 (DI-FABIO ROMANO [IT], et al) | Examination | - DE LA TORRE J C ET AL, "DIMETHYL SULFOXIDE IN CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM TRAUMA", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19750101), vol. 243, doi:10.1111/J.1749-6632.1975.TB25377.X, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 362 - 389, XP009106146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1975.tb25377.x | - DE LA TORRE J C ET AL, "DEXAMETHASONE AND DI METHYL SULFOXIDE IN EXPERIMENTAL TRANS ORBITAL CEREBRAL INFARCTION", STROKE, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (19761101), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 0039-2499, pages 577 - 583, XP009106150 | by applicant | - NARAYAN K, "NIH Collaborative Committee. Clinical trials in head injury", J NEUROTRAUMA, (2002), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 503 - 57 | - MONCADA, S.; PALMER,R.M.; HIGGS,E.A., "Nitric oxide: physiology, pathophysiology, and pharmacology", PHARMACOL. REV, (1991), vol. 43, pages 109 - 142, XP009007593 | - IGNARRO L; NAPOLI C, "Novel features of nitric oxide, endothelial nitric oxide synthase, and atherosclerosis", CURR ATHEROSCLER REP., (200407), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 281 - 7 | - BARBUL A, "Arginine: biochemistry, physiology, and therapeutic implications", J PARENT ENTERAL NUTR, (1986), vol. 10, pages 227 - 238, XP009071908 | - CHERIAN L, "L-Arginine and Free Radical Scavengers Increase Cerebral Blood Flow and Brain Tissue Nitric Oxide Concentrations after Controlled Cortical Impact Injury in Rats", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA, (200301), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1089/08977150360517209, pages 77 - 85, XP009106134 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/08977150360517209 | - HLATKY R., "The Role of Endothelial Nitric Oxide Synthase in the Cerebral Hemodynamics after Controlled Cortical Impact Injury in Mice", JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA, (2003), vol. 20, no. 10, pages 995 - 1006 | - PIATTI P; FRAGASSO G; MONTI LD; SETOLA E; LUCOTTI P; FERMO I; PARONI R; GALLUCCIO E; POZZA G; CHIERCHIA S, "Acute intravenous L-arginine infusion decreases endothelin-1 levels and improves endothelial function in patients with angina pectoris and normal coronary arteriograms: correlation with asymmetric dimethylarginine levels", CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. L07, no. 3, pages 429 - 36 | - KUBES P.; GRANGER,D.N., "Nitric oxide modulates microvascular permeability", AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 262, pages H611 - H615 | - KUBES P.; KANWAR S.; NIU X.F., "Nitric oxide synthesis inhibition induces leukocyte adhesion via superoxide and mast cells", FASEB J., (1993), vol. 7, pages 1293 - 1299 | - DE LA TORRE JC; STEFANO GB, "Evidence that Alzheimer's disease is a microvascular disorder: Role of constitutive nitric oxide", BRAIN RES REV., (2000), vol. 34, pages 119 - 136 | - VISSER JJ; HOEKMAN K, "Arginine supplementation in the prevention and treatment of osteoporosis", MED HYPOTHESES., (199411), vol. 43, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/0306-9877(94)90113-9, pages 339 - 42, XP026308807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-9877(94)90113-9 | - DE LA TORRE, J.C.; SURGEON, J.W., "Dexamethasone and DMSO in cerebral infarction", STROKE, (1976), vol. 7, pages 577 - 583 | - DE LA TORRE, J.C.; KAWANAGA, H.M.; GOODE, D.J.; JOHNSON, C.M.; KAJIHARA, K.; ROWED, D.W.; MULLAN, S., "Dimethyl sulfoxide in CNS trauma", ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1975), vol. 243, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1749-6632.1975.tb25377.x, pages 362 - 389, XP009106146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1975.tb25377.x | - BROWN FD; JOHNS LM; MULLAN S, "Dimethyl sulfoxide in experimental brain injury, with comparison to mannitol", J NEUROSURG., (198007), vol. 53, no. L, pages 58 - 62 | - KARACA M; KILIC E; YAZICI B; DEMIR S; DE LA TORRE JC, "Ischemic stroke in elderly patients treated with a free radical scavenger-glycolytic intermediate compound", NEUROL RES, (2002), vol. 24, pages 73 - 80 | - KARACA, M.; BILGIN, U.; AKAR, M.; DE LA TORRE, J.C., "Dimethyl sulfoxide lowers ICP after closed head trauma", EUR. J. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1991), vol. 40, pages 113 - 114 | - BENVENISTE H; DREJER J; SCHOUSBOE A; DIEMER NH, "Elevation of the extracellular concentrations of glutamate and aspartate in rat. hippocampus during transient cerebral ischemia monitored by intracerebral microdialysis.", J NEUROCHEM, (1984), vol. 43, pages 1369 - 74 | - KRISTIAN T; SIESJO; BK, "Calcium in ischemic cell death", STROKE, (1998), vol. 29, pages 705 - 18 | - ROSSI DJ; OSHIMA T; ATTWELL D, "Glutamate release in severe brain ischaemia is mainly by reversed uptake", NATURE, (2000), vol. 403, pages 316 - 21 | - BEZZI P; CARMIGNOTO, G; PASTI L; VESCE S; ROSSI D; RIZZINI BL; POZZAN T; VOLTERRA A, "Prostaglandins stimulate calcium-dependent glutamate release in astrocytes", NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 281 - 292 | - LU, C.; M.P. MATTSON, "Dimethyl sulfoxide suppresses NMDA- and AMPA-induced ion currents and calcium influx and protects against excitotoxic death in hippocampal neurons", EXP NEUROL, (200107), vol. 170, pages 180 - 185 | - MARSHALL LF; CAMP P; BOWERS S, "Dimethyl sulfoxide for the treatment of intracranial hypertension", J NEUROSURG, (1984), vol. 14, pages 659 - 664 | - ROBERTSON C.S. ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROTRAUMA, (200010), vol. 17, no. 10, page 945 |