EP1937445 - INVERTIBLE PUNCH TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiskars Brands, Inc. 2537 Daniels Street Madison, WI 53718-6772 / US | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Luc Chuong 1418 North Milwaukee Ave, Apartment 3 Chicago, IL 60622 / US | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Kevin, Donald 7083 Divine Rapids Road Park Falls, WI 54552 / US | 03 /
SCHULTZ, Craig, Alan 4114 Green Avenue Madison, Wisconsin 53704 / US | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
LAM, Luc Chuong 111 W. Wilson Street Apt. 110 Madison, Wisconsin 53703 / US | ||
02 /
SCHMIDT, Kevin, Donald 1103 Westridge Avenue Sun Prairie, Wisconsin 53590 / US | |||
03 /
SCHULTZ, Craig, Alan 4114 Green Avenue Madison, Wisconsin 53704 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06803477.6 | 11.09.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US35604 | Priority number, date | US20050228141 | 16.09.2005 Original published format: US 228141 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007035342 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937445 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937445 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B26F1/36 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B26D5/16 (EP,US);
B26F1/14 (EP,US);
B26F1/36 (EP,US);
B26F1/44 (EP,US);
B26F2001/4481 (EP,US);
Y10T83/929 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9425 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INVERTIERBARES STANZWERKZEUG | [2008/27] | English: | INVERTIBLE PUNCH TOOL | [2008/27] | French: | OUTIL DE PERFORATION INVERSABLE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.2009 | BE | 15.07.2009 | CY | 15.07.2009 | CZ | 15.07.2009 | DK | 15.07.2009 | EE | 15.07.2009 | FI | 15.07.2009 | IT | 15.07.2009 | LT | 15.07.2009 | LV | 15.07.2009 | NL | 15.07.2009 | PL | 15.07.2009 | RO | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | SI | 15.07.2009 | SK | 15.07.2009 | TR | 15.07.2009 | IE | 11.09.2009 | LU | 11.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | BG | 15.10.2009 | GR | 16.10.2009 | ES | 26.10.2009 | IS | 15.11.2009 | PT | 15.11.2009 | HU | 16.01.2010 | DE | 01.04.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 11.09.2009 | ||
LU | 11.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
HU | 16.01.2010 | ||
DE | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 11.09.2009 | ||
LU | 11.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 11.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 11.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 11.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
DE | 01.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
LT | 15.07.2009 | ||
LV | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
IS | 15.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002124420 (HSUAN YU HSUN [TW]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004129124 (CHAN KWOK KI [HK]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |