EP1929290 - METHOD FOR QUANTITATIVELY DETERMINING THE LDL PARTICLE NUMBER IN A DISTRIBUTION OF LDL CHOLESTEROL SUBFRACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berkeley Heartlab 839 Mitten Road Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLENDENEN, Faith 6242 Robin Hood Way Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 02 /
BOGGESS, Christopher 289 Huron Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 03 /
RUDERMAN, Frank 71 Creekside Drive San Rafael, CA 94903 / US | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Main, Malcolm Charles Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Main, Malcolm Charles Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06803789.4 | 18.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006US36310 | Priority number, date | US20050722051P | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 722051 P | US20050721825P | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 721825 P | US20050721665P | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 721665 P | US20050721756P | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 721756 P | US20050721617P | 29.09.2005 Original published format: US 721617 P | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007040974 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1929290 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/92 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G01N33/92 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | G01N33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | 28.03.2008 | BA | 28.03.2008 | HR | 28.03.2008 | MK | 28.03.2008 | RS | 28.03.2008 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTITATIVEN BESTIMMUNG DER LDL-TEILCHENZAHL IN EINER VERTEILUNG VON LDL-CHOLESTERIN-SUBFRAKTIONEN | [2008/24] | English: | METHOD FOR QUANTITATIVELY DETERMINING THE LDL PARTICLE NUMBER IN A DISTRIBUTION OF LDL CHOLESTEROL SUBFRACTIONS | [2008/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER DE MANIÈRE QUANTITATIVE LE NOMBRE DE PARTICULES LDL DANS UNE DISTRIBUTION DE SOUS-FRACTIONS DE CHOLESTÉROL LDL | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0141037 (BERKELEY HEARTLAB INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 10 - page 11; claims 1-20 *; | [Y]WO2005043171 (LIPOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19* page 3 - page 5; claims 1-33 *; | [Y] - KRAUSS, R. M. ET AL, "LOW-DENSITY-LIPOPROTEIN SUBCLASSES AND RESPONSE TO A LOW-FAT DIET IN HEALTHY MEN", AM J CLIN NUTR, USA, (1995), vol. 62, pages 478S - 487S, XP002503529 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * | [X] - HALLE M ET AL, "Differences in the concentration and composition of low-density lipoprotein subfraction particles between sedentary and trained hypercholesterolemic men", METABOLISM, CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL, W.B. SAUNDERS CO., PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (19970201), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0026-0495, pages 186 - 191, XP004538975 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0026-0495(97)90300-0 | International search | [Y]US6409660 (SJOEQVIST BENGT ARNE [SE]); | [Y]US6820057 (LOCH ANDREW [AU], et al) | [Y] - WIEMER ET AL., "Influence of low molecular weight heparin compared to conventional heparin for anticoagulation during haemodialysis on low density lipoprotein", NEPHROLOGY, DIALYSIS, TRANSPLANTATION, (2002), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 2231 - 2238, XP009108418 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ndt/17.12.2231 | [Y] - LATOUR ET AL., "Metabolism of apolipoprotein B-100 in a kindred with familial hypobetalipoproteinemia without a truncated form of apoB", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 38, pages 592 - 599, XP008125396 | [Y] - SARTIPY ET AL., "Phospholipase A2 Modification of Low Density Lipoproteins Forms Small High Density Particles with Increased Affinity for Proteoglycans and Glycosaminoglycans", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19990903), vol. 274, no. 36, pages 25913 - 25920, XP009108422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.36.25913 | [Y] - DE GRAAF ET AL., "Both Inherited Susceptibility and Environmental Exposure Determine the Low-Density Lipoprotein-Subfraction Pattern Distribution in Healthy Dutch Families", AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1992), vol. 51, pages 1295 - 1310 |