EP1941114 - OVERHEAD BEAM ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilian Holding Company 1800 N.E. Broadway Avenue Des Moines Iowa 50313-2644 / US | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULEY, Randy EFCO Corp. 1800 N.E. Broadway Avenue Des Moines, Iowa 50313 / US | 02 /
WALDSCHMITT, Thomas 2509 N.W. 3rd Ankeny, IA 50021 / US | 03 /
JENNINGS, Paul 18599-B Highway 20 Winthrop, Washington 988862 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Marches Intellectual Property Limited Wyastone Business Park Wyastone Leys Ganarew Monmouth NP25 3SR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Marches Intellectual Property Ltd Solutions House, Old Monmouth Road Whitchurch Ross-on-Wye, Herefordshire HR9 6DJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Marches Intellectual Property Ltd Solutions House, Old Monmouth Road Whitchurch Ross-on-Wye Hertfordshire HR9 6DJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Greaves Brewster LLP Indigo House Cheddar Business Park Wedmore Road Cheddar BS27 3EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06804280.3 | 02.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US38307 | Priority number, date | US20050722632P | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 722632 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007041427 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1941114 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/20, E04G9/08, E04G11/40, E04G11/48, E04G17/00, E04G11/46, E04G17/16 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
E04G17/16 (EP,US);
E04G11/40 (EP,US);
E04G11/46 (EP,US);
E04G11/48 (EP,US);
E04G17/001 (EP,US);
E04G9/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | E04G11/20 | ||
Former IPC [2008/28] | E04G9/08, E04G11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | ÜBERKOPFTRÄGERANORDNUNG | [2008/28] | English: | OVERHEAD BEAM ASSEMBLY | [2008/28] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE POUTRES SUSPENDU | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 05.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4016228 (SCHMIDT HANS HEINRICH) [A] 1-7* figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0359894 (SGB HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [X] 8-12 * column 1, line 1 - line 25; figure 2 * * column 2, line 3 - line 9 * * column 2, line 26 - line 37 * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]US6260311 (VLADIKOVIC PETER [CA]) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 3; figure 1 * * column 3, line 35 - line 41 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 18 *; | [A]US2002030293 (ROCK ERNST [AT]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US3239188 (ERIC GOSTLING PETER); | [X]US3845930 (METRAILER C) |