EP1978697 - A METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SUBSCRIBER LINE LAYER 2 ENCAPSULATION MODE TO BROADBAND ACCESS SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/33] |
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
WANG, Hao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805018.6 | 20.10.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006CN02809 | Priority number, date | CN20061007490 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: CN200610007490 | [2008/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093098 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1978697 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1978697 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/02, H04L12/46, H04L12/28 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/2872 (EP);
H04L12/4633 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04M11/062 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | H04L29/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG DER SCHICHT 2 VERKAPSELUNGS-MODUS EINER TEILNEHMERLEITUNG AN EINEN BREITBANDZUGANGSSERVER | [2008/41] | English: | A METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING SUBSCRIBER LINE LAYER 2 ENCAPSULATION MODE TO BROADBAND ACCESS SERVER | [2008/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE LE MODE D'ENCAPSULATION DE COUCHE 2 DE LA LIGNE D'ABONNÉ VERS UN SERVEUR D'ACCÈS À BANDE LARGE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2008 | Translation filed | 11.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2006 | AT | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | IE | 20.10.2012 | LU | 20.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
LU | 20.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9729563 (MICROCOM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,7-10; | [Y]WO9813764 (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [Y] 2-5,7-10 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6108350 (ARAUJO KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,7-10; | [XY]EP1124402 (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,7-10; | [XY]WO0228028 (EICON TECHNOLOGY CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,7-10; | [A]US6445715 (ANNAAMALAI ALAGU [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XY]US2002176365 (LUND SVEN O [DK]) [X] 1,6 [Y] 2-5,7-10 | International search | [A]WO0228028 (EICON TECHNOLOGY CORP [CA], et al); | [A]US6680940 (LEWIN AMIT [IL], et al); | [A]JP2004040586 (NTT FANET SYSTEMS CORP) | Examination | US2005152370 | by applicant | US6108350 | EP1124402 | US2002176365 | WO9729563 | WO0228028 | CN1674576 |