EP1934382 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATED SUBSTRATE BODY, SUBSTRATE BODY COMPRISING A COATING AND USE OF THE COATED SUBSTRATE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kennametal Widia Produktions GmbH & Co. KG Münchener Strasse 125-127 45145 Essen / DE | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOTTKE, Volkmar Holzstrasse 182 45479 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | 02 /
LENK, Doris Kolumbusstrasse 30 45472 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | 03 /
WESTPHAL, Hartmut Schulstrasse 16 36466 Dermbach/Rhön / DE | 04 /
VAN DEN BERG, Hendrikus Ligusterpad 41 5925 BT Venlo-Blerick / NL | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Vomberg, Friedhelm RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kaiserswerther Straße 215 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Vomberg, Friedhelm Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805375.0 | 07.10.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006DE01755 | Priority number, date | DE20051049393 | 15.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005049393 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045209 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1934382 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/36 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
C23C16/36 (EP,US);
Y10T407/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BESCHICHTETEN SUBSTRATKÖRPERS, SUBSTRATKÖRPER MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNG DES BESCHICHTETEN SUBSTRATKÖRPERS | [2008/26] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COATED SUBSTRATE BODY, SUBSTRATE BODY COMPRISING A COATING AND USE OF THE COATED SUBSTRATE BODY | [2008/26] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REALISER UN CORPS DE SUBSTRAT REVETU, CORPS DE SUBSTRAT PRESENTANT UN REVETEMENT, ET UTILISATION DU CORPS DE SUBSTRAT REVETU | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2505009 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [X] 1-13,15-22 * pages 7,8,10; tables 1,2 *; | [X]US5223337 (VAN DEN BERG HENDRIKUS [NL], et al) [X] 20-22 * column 8 *; | [X]EP1138800 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0024] * | Examination | US2002086147 |