EP1934021 - KNIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARTOR KG Heider Hof 60 42653 Solingen / DE | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLEI, Gudula Lützowstr. 238 42653 Solingen / DE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwaltskanzlei Friedrich-Engels-Allee 430-432 42283 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Ostriga, Harald, et al Patentanwälte Ostriga & Sonnet Postfach 20 16 53 42216 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805395.8 | 10.10.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006DE01777 | Priority number, date | DE20051049411 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005049411 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042001 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1934021 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1934021 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B26B5/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
B26B5/003 (EP,US);
B26B5/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSER | [2008/26] | English: | KNIFE | [2008/26] | French: | CUTTER | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2007 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.03.2010 | CZ | 24.03.2010 | DK | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | IT | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SE | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | HU | 25.09.2010 | LU | 10.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
LU | 10.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
IT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH547686 (SMART AG) [A] * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 25; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE3622343 (BEERMANN KG MARTOR ARGENTAX [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 47; figures 1-3 * |