EP1948426 - MOVABLE INJECTION PASSAGES DURING THE MANUFACTURE OF LAMINATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM GLASFIBER A/S Rolles Moellevej 1 6640 Lunderskov / DK | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSEN, Torben, Krogsdal parken 14 DK-6640 Lunderskov / DK | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Jensen, Peter Kim, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Jensen, Peter Kim, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2008/31] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 06805566.4 | 14.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006DK00628 | Priority number, date | DK20050001576 | 14.11.2005 Original published format: DK 200501576 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054101 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948426 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948426 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/54, B29C70/44, B29L9/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
B29C70/443 (EP,US);
B29C70/548 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHE EINSPRITZKANÄLE BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON LAMINATEN | [2008/31] | English: | MOVABLE INJECTION PASSAGES DURING THE MANUFACTURE OF LAMINATES | [2008/31] | French: | PASSAGES D'INJECTION MOBILES PENDANT LA FABRICATION DE STRATIFIES | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | IT | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | IE | 14.11.2009 | LU | 14.11.2009 | BG | 30.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
LU | 14.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
LU | 14.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
BG | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 14.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0348831 (WEIGEL ANGELA [DE], et al) [A] 1-18,1-18,1-18 * claims 1-3,5 * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-3,5 * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-3,5 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1038656 (LS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-18,1-18,1-18 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] *; | [A]DE19926896 (VER FOERDERUNG INST KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1-18,1-18,1-18 * claims 1-3,6,7 * * figures 2-4 * * claims 1-3,6,7 * * figures 2-4 * * claims 1-3,6,7 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2002155186 (WALSH SHAW M [US]) [A] 1-18,1-18,1-18 * figures 1a,1b * * paragraphs [0013] - [0020] * * figures 1a,1b * * paragraphs [0013] - [0020] * * figures 1a,1b * * paragraphs [0013] - [0020] * |