EP1965886 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CHARACTERISTICS OF AN AIR FILTER CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/37] | AIR FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CHARACTERISTICS OF AN AIR FILTER CARTRIDGE | ||
[2009/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UHLAND, Matthias Frauenstr. 93 89073 Ulm / DE | 02 /
HILBERER, Eduard Am Damm 5 68766 Hockenheim / DE | 03 /
KROCKENBERGER, Klaus Friedrich-Rückert-Weg 11b 90547 Stein / DE | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG, Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Mattusch, Gundula c/o Knorr-Bremse AG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805769.4 | 19.09.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006EP09092 | Priority number, date | DE20051050635 | 20.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005050635 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045318 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965886 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1965886 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24, B01D46/42, B01D27/10, B01D35/14, B60T17/00 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
B01D46/2411 (EP,US);
B01D46/009 (EP,US);
B60T17/004 (EP,US);
B01D2201/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN VON EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER LUFTFILTERPATRONE | [2009/16] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CHARACTERISTICS OF AN AIR FILTER CARTRIDGE | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR IDENTIFIER LES PROPRIÉTÉS D'UNE CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE À AIR | [2009/16] |
Former [2008/37] | LUFTFILTERPATRONE UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN VON EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER LUFTFILTERPATRONE | ||
Former [2008/37] | AIR FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING THE CHARACTERISTICS OF AN AIR FILTER CARTRIDGE | ||
Former [2008/37] | CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE À AIR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR IDENTIFIER LES PROPRIÉTÉS D'UNE CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE À AIR | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09000489.6 / EP2044998 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | IE | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | LV | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | PL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | AT | 19.09.2009 | LU | 19.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
AT | 19.09.2009 | ||
LU | 19.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
AT | 19.09.2009 | ||
LU | 19.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
AT | 19.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 22.07.2009 | |
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02074418 (ULTRAFILTER INTERNAT AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10160429 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10151270 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0032298 (PSI GLOBAL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 16 *; | [A]EP1048336 (ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER NV [BE]) [A] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]EP1479428 (SGT SINGAPORE HOLDINGS PTE LTD [SG]) [A] 1-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0034] , [0035]; claims 9-11 *; | [Y]DE10359739 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0023] *; | [Y]EP1498171 (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * |