EP2030216 - PROTECTION SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRNER, Markus Grosshabersdorfer Str. 12 90513 Zirndorf / DE | 02 /
LOOS, Klaus Brunnleithenweg 1A 90610 Winkelhaid / DE | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2012/30] |
Former [2011/09] | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805854.4 | 25.09.2006 | [2009/10] | WO2006EP09295 | Priority number, date | DE20061027140 | 12.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006027140 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144016 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030216 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030216 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H73/18, H01H9/34, H01H9/46, H01H71/08, H01H71/10, H01H71/24, H01H71/52, H01H71/74 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
H01H71/082 (EP,US);
H01H71/1018 (EP,US);
H01H71/1027 (EP,US);
H01H71/2409 (EP,US);
H01H71/2454 (EP,US);
H01H71/526 (EP,US);
H01H71/7427 (EP,US);
H01H73/18 (EP,US);
H01H9/34 (EP,US);
H01H9/342 (EP,US);
H01H9/46 (EP,US);
H01H2009/348 (EP,US);
H01H2071/086 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHALTER | [2009/10] | English: | PROTECTION SWITCH | [2009/10] | French: | DISJONCTEUR DE PROTECTION | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2006 | CY | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | IT | 25.07.2012 | LT | 25.07.2012 | LV | 25.07.2012 | RO | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | IE | 25.09.2012 | LU | 25.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
LU | 25.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
RO | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
LV | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
LT | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 25.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9512888 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AG OESTER [AT]) [Y] 1,26-32 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2468422 (WOOD JOSEPH D) [Y] 1,26-32 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0251160 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,26-32 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5457173 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,26-32 * figures -a *; | [A]JPS5495368 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,26-32 * figure - *; | [A]JPS56143633 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,26-32 * figure - *; | [AD]FR2661776 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [AD] 1; | [AD]EP0538149 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [AD] 1 |