EP1940993 - ALPHA-ETHOXYSILANE-MODIFIED POLYMERS, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHON, Thomas Kappeler Strasse 3a 40597 Dusseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Jennifer Föhrenweg 35 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
TAMCKE, Thomas Haus-Endt-Strasse 95 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
GAWLIK, Patrick Heidstrasse 47 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2008/28] | Application number, filing date | 06806391.6 | 19.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006EP10082 | Priority number, date | DE20051051921 | 29.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005051921 | [2008/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007048538 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940993 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09J171/02, C08L101/10, C09J201/10, C09D201/10 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
C08G65/336 (EP,US);
C08G18/718 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | ALPHA-ETHOXYSILAN MODIFIZIERTE POLYMERE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2008/28] | English: | ALPHA-ETHOXYSILANE-MODIFIED POLYMERS, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2008/28] | French: | POLYMERES A MODIFICATION ALPHA-ETHOXYSILANE, LEUR PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 15.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2004022625 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE], et al) [X] 1-14,19-22 * example 6 * [A] 15-18; | [XA]DE10237271 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]) [X] 1-14,19-22 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056]; example 3 * [A] 15-18; | [XA]US4562237 (OKUNO EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,19-22 * claim 5 * [A] 15-18; | [XA]US5068304 (HIGUCHI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,19-22 * example 1 * [A] 15-18 | by applicant | DE19727029 | WO9948942 | WO02068501 | DE10237271 | WO2004022625 | US4562237 | US5068304 |